Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez Ruben Santos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cortney Brittan Nichole, Lira David Richard, Girardi Thomas V, Johnston Thomas J, Lannen Rachel Marilyn, (total of 5) See All against Martinez Ruben Santos, Valenzuela Javier Aviel, represented by Lally Ravinder Kaur, Said Nadin S, Macdonald Scott Lee, Moon Michael Francis, Wagoner James Patrick, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael E. Whitaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Objection OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF COUNSEL; Filed by: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order re Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Jury Question Question 1 - 10:07AM; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Appellant)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of David R. Lira; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant); As to: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions Refused; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Opposition OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NEW TRIA; Filed by: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Jury Question Question 2 - 02:26 PM; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge Ongkeko; Dept D; Santa Monica; OTR Today at 1:30 p.m. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Motion re: For Directed Verdict; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Ongkeko; Dept D; Santa Monica; OTR Today at 1:30 p.m.)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: July 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: July 20, 2021Exhibit List
Date: July 23, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: July 23, 2021Exhibit List
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: July 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO READ DESIGNATED PASSAGES OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT
Date: August 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 09, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID R. LIRA
Date: August 09, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO READ DESIGNATED PASSAGES OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT - AMENDED
Date: August 11, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 13, 2021Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR DIRECTED VERDICT
Date: August 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 17, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION QUESTION 3 - 03:20 PM
Date: August 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 18, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION QUESTION 1 - 10:07AM
Date: August 18, 2021Judgment
Date: August 19, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN
Date: August 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 19, 2021Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: August 19, 2021Special Verdict
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: August 19, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS WITHDRAWN
Date: August 23, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS REFUSED
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: September 07, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED] JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT
Date: September 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: September 08, 2021Motion for New Trial
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMBER MOELTER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRITTAN CORTNEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: September 17, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 27, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION JUROR DECLARATIONS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: September 27, 2021Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 27, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NEW TRIA
Date: September 29, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: October 01, 2021Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: October 05, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO JUROR DECLARATIONS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: October 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID R. LIRA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: October 08, 2021Motion to Tax Costs
Date: October 08, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: October 15, 2021Other - - OTHER - RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: October 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 15, 2021Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: November 29, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: December 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CLARIFYING THE C...)
Date: December 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: December 06, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 06, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RYAN N. GILBERT, ESQ.
Date: December 10, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: December 22, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: December 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: January 04, 2022Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: January 14, 2022Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: January 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 27, 2022Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (Judge Hiroshige)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Read Designated Passages of Deposition Transcript)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of David R. Lira)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Read Designated Passages of Deposition Transcript - AMENDED)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Motion re: (For Directed Verdict)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Jury Question (Question 3 - 03:20 PM)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Jury Question (Question 2 - 02:26 PM)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Jury Question (Question 1 - 10:07AM)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Withdrawn)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Judgment (on Jury Verdict)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Refused)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/08/2021)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Amber Moelter in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Brittan Cortney in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Declaration (JUROR DECLARATIONS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF AMY MOELTER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NEW TRIA)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Brittan N. Cortney in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Objection (to Juror Declarations in Opposition to Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (re Hearing on Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Declaration (of David R. Lira in Support of Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Other - (Ruling on Plaintiff's motion for new trial)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Motion of New Trial filed by Ruben Santos Mart...))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Peremptory Challenge)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Clarifying the C...))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF RYAN N. GILBERT, ESQ.)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Ex Parte Application for an Order Clarifying the Court's TSC Orders)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order (Court Order re Motion of New Trial filed by Ruben Santos Mart...)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Jury Question Question 3 - 03:20 PM; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF RYAN N. GILBERT, ESQ. Filed by: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Objection to Defendant's Peremptory Challenge; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Appeal - Opinion Received B317158; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 31, 2023Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for New Trial; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions Withdrawn; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: JAVIER AVIEL VALENZUELA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Other - Ruling on Plaintiff's motion for new trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: RUBEN SANTOS MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's General Objection/Opposition to Defendant's Motions in Limine)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S GENERAL OBJECTIONOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Judgment (PROPOSED] JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.