Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bautista Sergio, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Hoffman Steve Anthony, Hoffman Steve Anthony Esq., against City Of Los Angeles, Los Angeles World Airports, represented by Asiano Ann Marilynne Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorgina T. Rizk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2019 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Los Angeles World Airports (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 24, 2019Complaint
Date: May 24, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 21, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: June 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: June 30, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: July 19, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: July 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 20, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: July 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 21, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: June 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 24, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: December 23, 2020Answer
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 28, 2021Separate Statement
Date: November 29, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 29, 2021Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: June 02, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: June 09, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: June 13, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Los Angeles World Airports (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Informal Discovery Confe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Motions to Compel...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Los Angeles World Airports (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Sergio Bautista (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order of PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.