Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Perez Yvette Darlene, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Shegerian Carney R., against Cabrera Malena, Inland Empire Health Plan, Magana Yesenia, Marin Chris, Mass Jane, (total of 11) See All represented by Rudnick Stuart W., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management148 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time306 days |
Complaint
Date: March 27, 2019Case Management Statement; Filed by: Yvette Darlene Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Yvette Darlene Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Carney R Shegerian (Attorney)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Yvette Darlene Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Yvette Darlene Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00RECEIPT Returned Receipt for Transmitted Record - Transfer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition MTN TRANSFER VENUE. (PEREZ); Filed by: Yvette Darlene Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Other - Ruling Re: Defendants' Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 27, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 27, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 05, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 16, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: April 23, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: May 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: May 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CMC (PEREZ).FINAL
Date: July 05, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 11, 2019Motion for Change of Venue
Date: October 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 22, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 13, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION MTN TRANSFER VENUE. (PEREZ)
Date: January 13, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS’ REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: January 17, 2020Other - - OTHER - RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: January 27, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 31, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/31/2020
Date: January 31, 2020Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 20, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- PARTIAL)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue; Case Management Confer...))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Other - (Ruling Re: Defendants' Motion for Change of Venue)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice ( OF CMC (PEREZ).FINAL)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/31/2020)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Opposition (MTN TRANSFER VENUE. (PEREZ))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: February 20, 2020Motion for Change of Venue
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration ( OF BARBORA PULMANOVA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Declaration ( OF IRMA NAPOLINI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Outgoing Transfer
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.