Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rosales Luz, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Fraigun Marina Kats, against Pro Boxing Supplies Inc., Qubadi Abdul, Rosales Luz, represented by Rudd Christopher Lee, Shamash Charles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management100 days |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY
Date: January 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Final Statement of Decision; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default B314255, NA; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: June 14, 2023Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B314255; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 17, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Proposed Statement of Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B314255; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Tentative Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Response to Proposed Settled Statement; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Respondent)
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Declaration for Accrued Interest on Judgment; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant); ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Opposition TO DEMURRER; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Ruling Re: Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant); ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Proposed Statement of Decision; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Objection TO DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance NOA B314255; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Declaration for Prejudgment Interest; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Statement of Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant); ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: ABDUL QUBADI (Appellant)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant); ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00After Trial; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA B314255 NO PROP STATE; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: June 07, 2023Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: June 07, 2023Request to Exonerate and Release Cash Bond; Filed by: ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: August 04, 2023Appeal Document B314255; DCA ORDER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: LUZ ROSALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B314255, NA07.22.21; PER 8.140(b); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: PRO BOXING SUPPLIES, INC. (Defendant); ABDUL QUBADI (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 07, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: June 07, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 07, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: June 07, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 24, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: June 27, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 01, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 11, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: March 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020
Date: April 23, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 17, 2020Jury Instructions
Date: January 14, 2021Witness List
Date: January 14, 2021Exhibit List
Date: January 14, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: January 21, 2021Witness List
Date: January 21, 2021Exhibit List
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 24, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY ESTIMATE))
Date: April 26, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY ESTIMATE))
Date: April 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY ESTIMATE))
Date: April 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TENTATIVE DECISION)
Date: May 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-5 DAY ESTIMATE))
Date: May 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 14, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 04, 2021Other - - PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: June 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: June 07, 2021Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: June 29, 2021Statement of Decision - FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: June 29, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL
Date: June 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: June 29, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: July 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 06, 2021Motion to Tax Costs
Date: July 14, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: August 02, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: August 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: September 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: September 16, 2021Order - RULING RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: September 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 23, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 09/23/2021
Date: September 23, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: September 23, 2021Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: November 05, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT (AFTER COURT TRIAL)
Date: November 08, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: November 17, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: December 03, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: December 20, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: September 01, 2022Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE NOA 7/22/21 B314255
Date: February 03, 2023Response - RESPONSE TO PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT
Date: March 09, 2023Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B314255
Date: March 16, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 20, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION FOR ACCRUED INTEREST ON JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2023Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )
Date: March 22, 2023Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT B314255; DCA ORDER
Date: April 07, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 07, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: June 14, 2023Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Objection (TO DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial, FSC and (Related Motion/Discovery Dates)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Answer (Pro Boxing Supplies, Inc. and Abdul Qubadi's Answer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((PM CSR))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Tentative Decision) of 05/04/2021)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Evidence of the Defendants' Financial Con...))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day estimate)))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff?s Post-Trial Brief Pursuant to Court?s May 4, 2021 Order)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Tentative Decision))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((AM CSR))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Tentative Decision
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3 -5 day estimate)))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day estimate)))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Proposed Statement of Decision))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Proposed Statement of Decision) of 06/07/2021)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Proposed Statement of Decision
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Final Statement of Decision
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Evidence of the Defendants' Financial Con...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/07/2021)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Declaration (for Prejudgment Interest)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Judgment After Trial
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Statement of Decision) of 06/29/2021)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/06/2021)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Statement of Decision))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 19, 2019Complaint
Date: March 19, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 19, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 25, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 20, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 24, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 07, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: June 09, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day estimate)))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day estimate)))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.