Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Doe Jane, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Hathaway Mark Mcclellan, against The Trustees Of The California State University A California Corporation, White Timothy P, represented by Hsu William Casey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time216 days |
Petition - Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Relief
Date: January 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum
Date: January 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 22, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 22, 2019Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: January 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 11, 2019Summons - Summons on Petition
Date: February 05, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 11, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: March 25, 2019Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: April 03, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: April 25, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: April 29, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: July 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: August 26, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 23, 2019Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PETITIONER, JANE DOE, TO HAVE KRISTINA W. SUPLER AP...))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 26, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Answer (to Petition for Writ of Mandate and Declaratory Relief)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Petition (for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Relief)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: August 26, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.