Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gaveet Waterproofing And Construction Llc, Knibb Design Corp, Knibb Sean, The Picard Family Company Inc. Dba Watson Plumbing, Steinberg Michael H, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Johnson Edward E, Light Ryan Waters, Steinberg Michael, against Alzona Gary, Condo Jr. Nelson S., Condo Nelson S., Gaveet Construction And Water Proofing Llc A Limited Liabiltiy Company, Hewitt Construction, (total of 16) See All represented by Davila Nicholas W, Dowsing Sean, Eisenbaum Michael Scott, Fischer Temre, Grosfeld Robert, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management330 days |
Filing DateApril 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions448 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: April 11, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 11, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 11, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 15, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 23, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 06, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 28, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 29, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 03, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 29, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 23, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: December 16, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: December 18, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 10, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: January 14, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 16, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH POWERS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: January 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCESERVICES
Date: January 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH POWERS IN SUPPORT
Date: January 31, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: February 04, 2020Answer
Date: February 04, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 04, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: February 05, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 21, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 20, 2020Statement of the Case
Date: February 25, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 26, 2020Answer
Date: March 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWARD E. JOHNSON
Date: March 03, 2020Answer
Date: March 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STIPULATION AND ORDER;)
Date: March 25, 2020Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS
Date: March 25, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 02, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020
Date: April 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATES
Date: April 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020
Date: April 22, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 19, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 01, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 09, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: July 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 25, 2020Answer
Date: August 25, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 26, 2020Answer
Date: September 01, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: September 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO ST...)
Date: September 15, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING HEWITT ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 16, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 22, 2020Request for Refund / Order
Date: September 23, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STIPULATION;)
Date: September 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 08, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 29, 2020Answer
Date: November 10, 2020Answer
Date: December 04, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 15, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SAC
Date: December 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER
Date: December 18, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 20, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: March 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 23, 2021
Date: April 14, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 28, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE
Date: August 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE T...)
Date: September 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REFEREES DISCLOSURES
Date: September 10, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: October 12, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY
Date: November 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DISCOVERY REFEREE'S REPORT
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS
Date: January 31, 2022Notice - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 07, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 10, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 04, 2022Answer
Date: April 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: April 12, 2022Order Appointing Referee
Date: May 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER SETTING DATES FOR TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 13, 2022Answer
Date: April 13, 2022Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO OBJECTION
Date: July 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 27, 2022Separate Statement
Date: July 27, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: August 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 03, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 08, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 08, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING OFF CALENDAR AND RESCHEDULING
Date: August 16, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 18, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 07, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 29, 2022Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: November 14, 2022Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: November 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRI...)
Date: December 01, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING OFF CALENDAR
Date: December 01, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER
Date: December 01, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: December 02, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 05, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NELSON CONDO AND M&B CUSTOMS' DEMURRER
Date: January 12, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO HEWITT CONSTRUCTION'S DEMURRER
Date: January 12, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 27, 2023Answer
Date: February 06, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PERSON MOST QUALIFIED FOR DEFENDANT HEWITT CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: February 27, 2023Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (4TH)
Date: March 03, 2023Separate Statement
Date: March 07, 2023Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: March 07, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 07, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 07, 2023Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: March 08, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/14/2023
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: March 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 14, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 15, 2023Separate Statement
Date: March 17, 2023Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION
Date: March 17, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION KARIN KUEMEREL ISO MTN TO COMPEL - SITE INSPECTION
Date: March 17, 2023Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: March 23, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 23, 2023Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: March 23, 2023Answer
Date: March 30, 2023Answer
Date: April 03, 2023Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 03, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 04, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDDY JOHNSON
Date: April 06, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 06, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 06, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: April 10, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: April 10, 2023Answer
Date: April 11, 2023Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL RE SITE INSPECTION KNK
Date: April 11, 2023Answer
Date: April 14, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDERS AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: April 13, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 14, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 14, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 17, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 17, 2023Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF MICHAEL H. STEINBERG
Date: April 18, 2023Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF EDWARD E. JOHNSON
Date: April 18, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: April 21, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 26, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF UNDERTAKING
Date: May 01, 2023Proof of Service - No Service
Date: May 03, 2023Answer
Date: May 03, 2023Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE
Date: May 03, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWARD E. JOHNSON
Date: May 03, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: May 04, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWARD E. JOHNSON
Date: May 12, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 12, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 18, 2023Writ of - WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AFTER HEARING FOR SEAN KNIBB
Date: May 19, 2023Writ of - WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AFTER HEARING FOR KNIBB DESIGN CORP.
Date: May 19, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED WRITS OF ATTACHMENT AFTER HEARING
Date: May 19, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 23, 2023Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 23, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' ISSUANCE OF RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: May 25, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF FILING REDLINE OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 26, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF WRITS OF ATTACHMENT
Date: May 30, 2023Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: May 30, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS
Date: June 08, 2023Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 05, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: June 12, 2023Writ of - WRIT OF ATTACHMENT - EX PARTE
Date: June 14, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWARD E. JOHNSON
Date: June 21, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 04, 2021Answer
Date: June 28, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: June 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 28, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: July 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ON JULY 7, 2021
Date: July 06, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: July 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 02, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 19, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 19, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH POWERS
Date: October 19, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION
Date: October 20, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH POWERS
Date: October 27, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION SEAN KNIBB AND KNIBB DESIGN CORP.'S OPPOSITION
Date: October 27, 2021Response - RESPONSE SEAN KNIBB AND KNIBB DESIGN CORP.'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS
Date: October 27, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 28, 2021Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 02, 2021Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: November 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF DISCOVERY REFEREE'S REPORT
Date: November 17, 2021Answer
Date: March 11, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 21, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: March 14, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 29, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 18, 2022Default entered as to Hewitt Construction; On the Complaint filed by Sheeri Steinberg, et al. on
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Reply reply to opposition to demurrer; Filed by: Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sean Knibb (Defendant); Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sean Knibb (Defendant); Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Declaration of Edward E. Johnson; Filed by: Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: GAVEET CONSTRUCTION AND WATER PROOFING, LLC, a limited liabiltiy company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Sheeri Steinberg, et al. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00; On the Cross-Complaint filed by Knibb Design Corp, et al. on
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: M&M Sheet Metal & Rain Gutter (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: The Picard Family Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Michael H Steinberg, et al. on
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation and Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st)) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by The Picard Family Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Initial Discovery Motion and Re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sean Knibb (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requesting Party Added ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by NELSON S. CONDO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Cross-Complainant); Sean Knibb (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re Cross-Complaints)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by GAVEET CONSTRUCTION AND WATER PROOFING, LLC, a limited liabiltiy company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sean Knibb (Defendant); Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Picard Family Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re Cross-Complaints)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by The Picard Family Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO ST...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by GAVEET CONSTRUCTION AND WATER PROOFING, LLC, a limited liabiltiy company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (3rd)) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Referee Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff'...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Default) Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff); Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by The Picard Family Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward E. Johnson) Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Cross-Defendant); Sean Knibb (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by NELSON S. CONDO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by M&M Sheet Metal & Rain Gutter (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Temre Fischer (Attorney)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDERS) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Response (Response to Objection) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Reply (reply to opposition to demurrer) Filed by Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Hearing on Application for Wri...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: WILLIAM HEWITT dba HEWITT CONS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Taking Hearing Off Calendar) Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (...))
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice Of Lodging Proposed Order)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Temre Fischer (Attorney)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Notice Notice of Taking Hearing Off Calendar; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Sean Knibb (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Response Response to Objection; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Sean Knibb (Defendant); Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Brief Supplemental; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Sean Knibb (Defendant); Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Initial Discovery Motion and Re...) of )
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Continuing Hearing Dates
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Default)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCESERVICES)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Nelson S. Condo, Jr. To Respond To Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Extending time to respond to SAC)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph Powers In Support)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Initial Discovery Motion and Re...))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike portions of first amended complaint)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO ST...) of )
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (regarding Hewitt Answer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 7, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 23, 2021)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Opposition (SEAN KNIBB and KNIBB DESIGN CORP?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF HEWITT CONSTRUCTION)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation and Order;))
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...) of )
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO ST...))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re Cross-Complaints))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE T...) of )
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff'...))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Reply (reply to opposition to demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE T...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Appointing Discovery Referee)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph Powers In Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (Sean Knibb and Knibb Design Corp.'s opposition)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward E. Johnson)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (3rd))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDERS)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of orders at case management conference)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Amendment to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Discovery Referee's Report)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requesting Party Added ...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation;))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF APRIL 29, 2021 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE TO JULY 30, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff ...))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (EXTENDING TIME FOR NELSON S. CONDO, JR. TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice (Consent for Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (...) of )
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Response (Sean Knibb and Knibb Design Corp.'s response and objections)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Joseph Powers)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph Powers)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice (Of Discovery Referee's Report)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: The Picard Family Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NELSON S. CONDO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Knibb Design Corp (Defendant); Sean Knibb (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Knibb Design Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gaveet Waterproofing and Construction LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sean Knibb (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Referee; Signed and Filed by: Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Picard Family Company, Inc. dba Watson Plumbing (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: DEFENDANT HEWITT CONSTRUCTION?...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Picard Family Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Hewitt Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff); Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Sheeri Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Telephone Conference Re: Defendant William Hewitt dba Hewitt ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - to Third Ame...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Michael H Steinberg (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hewitt Constuction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Default)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph Powers In Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph Powers In Support)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCESERVICES)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward E. Johnson)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice (of orders at case management conference)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation and Order;))
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike portions of first amended complaint)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO ST...))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (regarding Hewitt Answer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation;))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation;) of 09/28/2020)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re Cross-Complaints))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Amendment to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Extending time to respond to SAC)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Initial Discovery Motion and Re...))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (EXTENDING TIME FOR NELSON S. CONDO, JR. TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 23, 2021)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 7, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF APRIL 29, 2021 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE TO JULY 30, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re Cross-Complaints))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice (Consent for Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requesting Party Added ...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference on July 7, 2021)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff'...))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Opposition (SEAN KNIBB and KNIBB DESIGN CORP?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF HEWITT CONSTRUCTION)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Reply (reply to opposition to demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE T...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Appointing Discovery Referee)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff ...))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REFEREES DISCLOSURES)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Joseph Powers)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice Of Lodging Proposed Order)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice (Of Discovery Referee's Report)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Discovery Referee's Report)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE AND FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Response (Sean Knibb and Knibb Design Corp.'s response and objections)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Opposition (Sean Knibb and Knibb Design Corp.'s opposition)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph Powers)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDERS)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Stipulation;) of )
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re Cross-Complaints))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REFEREES DISCLOSURES)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference on July 7, 2021)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.