Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bertrand, David G, Churchill-Johnson, Dorothy, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Coffin, Mark T, against Berry, Jessica, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateMay 07, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Defamation (13) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Court Trial
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Court Trial
Date: October 26, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Court Trial
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Court Trial
Date: October 28, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Court Trial
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Court Trial
Date: November 09, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Judgment, Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Trial Brief, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: June 16, 2021Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: March 03, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Reply, Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Objection, Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Motion, Filed
Date: November 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: May 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: May 07, 2019Summons Issued, Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Proof of Publication, Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 28, 2019Notice of Non-availability, Filed
Date: July 16, 2019General Denial, Filed
Date: August 06, 2019Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed
Date: August 07, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Order, Filed
Date: September 27, 2019Proof of Service, Filed
Date: October 30, 2019Document, Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Document, Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Document, Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Document, Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Document, Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Proof of Service, Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Proof of Service by Mail, Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Proof of Service, Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service by Mail, Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Proof of Service by Mail, Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Proof of Service by Mail, Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Change of Address, Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Document, Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: February 08, 2021Motion
Date: October 26, 2020Reject Letter
Date: May 06, 2021Order, Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Order from Court of Appeal, Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: October 15, 2020Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Statement of Damages, Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: October 25, 2021Motion: Admissions
Date: January 06, 2020Statement of Damages, Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal, Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Remittitur, Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 09, 2019Opposition, Filed
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Order to Show Cause: Contempt
Date: March 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: May 28, 2019Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 06, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment & Declaration, Filed
Date: August 22, 2019Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: October 30, 2019Settlement Conference
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 10, 2019Order, Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Order, Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: May 17, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Reject Letter
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Motion
Date: January 11, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Complaint, Filed
Date: May 07, 2019Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: September 23, 2019Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: March 08, 2021Order, Filed
Date: May 29, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: September 21, 2020Reject Letter
Date: October 27, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Filing Remittitur - Dismissed, Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 16, 2019Settlement Conference
Date: July 10, 2020Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: December 28, 2020Motion: Strike
Date: April 05, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Motion: Set Aside
Date: September 23, 2019Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: March 23, 2021Reject Letter
Date: June 16, 2021Reject Letter
Date: July 15, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 28, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 11, 2021Reject Letter
Date: November 20, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Notice of Appeal, Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: November 09, 2020Order, Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 22, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 29, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: December 16, 2019Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed - Notice of Judgment re PLAINTIFFS' JUDGMENT FORDEFAULT PROVE UP TRIAL (DEFAMATION/ELDERABUSE) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Exhibits Returned to Counsel |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Judgment, Filed for Default Prove Up Trial (Defamation / Elder Abuse) for Plaintiffs and against Defendant |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Under Submission
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief, Filed Plaintiffs' Closing Brief for Default Prove Up |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration/Affidavit Declaration, Filed Declaration of David G. Bertrand (Defamation Action) |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration/Affidavit Declaration, Filed Declaration of Mark T. Coffin |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Court Trial Held |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.