Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cpi Chico Beneficiary Llc, Ta Chico Llc, Hk Deluxe Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Fox, Daniel William, against Hk Deluxe Llc, represented by Wilson, Dennis Mac, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateApril 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial759 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions292 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Cross Complaint - No Fee
Date: May 09, 2019Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: July 18, 2019Order
Date: July 18, 2019Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 17, 2019Demurrer
Date: June 28, 2019Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: July 18, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 28, 2019Ex Parte Application - No Fee
Date: July 17, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 24, 2019Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 17, 2019Reply
Date: August 27, 2019Notice
Date: March 24, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 14, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: August 21, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 24, 20203-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access
Date: April 01, 2020Demurrer
Date: September 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 17, 2019Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: January 22, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: September 16, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 15, 2019Demurrer
Date: March 24, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: January 27, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 24, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: January 27, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: January 28, 2021Reply
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: January 28, 2021Demurrer
Date: February 10, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: March 10, 2021Order
Date: February 23, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: March 19, 2021Demurrer
Date: May 03, 2021Declaration
Date: May 03, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: May 19, 2021Reply
Date: May 25, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: July 15, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: June 23, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: June 10, 2021Ruling
Date: June 08, 2021Ruling
Date: July 28, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: July 28, 2021Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: September 07, 2021Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: September 14, 2021Declaration
Date: November 15, 2019Declaration
Date: March 24, 2020Proof of Service
Date: February 03, 2021Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: April 05, 2019Reply
Date: July 21, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 07, 2021Request
Date: March 24, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 05, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: May 24, 2019Declaration
Date: October 29, 2021Change of Address
Date: July 01, 2019Declaration
Date: October 29, 2021Declaration
Date: June 28, 2019Proof of Service
Date: August 30, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 21, 2019Declaration
Date: March 24, 2020Proof of Service
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 03, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 20, 2022Declaration
Date: January 26, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 26, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 28, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 02, 2022Declaration
Date: January 20, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 18, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: July 30, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 29, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: October 29, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 28, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 24, 2019Proof of Mailing
Date: July 28, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: July 28, 2021Proof of Service
Date: July 21, 2021Proof of Service
Date: June 23, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 02, 2021Motion Hearings - Postdisposition
Date: February 02, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 03, 2021Stipulation
Date: May 26, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: May 09, 2019Proof of Mailing
Date: March 19, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 09, 2019Order
Date: February 02, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: March 26, 2021Reply
Date: January 26, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 05, 2019Proof of Service
Date: March 10, 2021Stipulation
Date: March 17, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 21, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 10, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: December 10, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: February 10, 2021Declaration
Date: January 26, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: February 24, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: January 13, 2021Declaration
Date: October 29, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: August 03, 2020Declaration
Date: October 29, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 29, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 22, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: January 22, 2020Proof of Service
Date: January 14, 2020Order
Date: January 12, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: August 03, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: June 02, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: June 01, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: May 27, 2020Order
Date: December 16, 2019Notice
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Rescheduling
Date: April 01, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: March 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 02, 2019Order
Date: January 22, 2020Notice
Date: December 20, 2019Proof of Service
Date: November 15, 2019Proof of Service
Date: September 17, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2019Settlement Conference
Date: September 24, 2021Notice
Date: March 26, 2021Settlement Conference
Date: August 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 03, 2021Demurrer
Date: June 02, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: February 21, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: January 08, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 02, 2019Declaration
Date: July 17, 2019Complaint
Date: April 05, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 28, 2019Exhibits in Support of Judgment
Date: November 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Eliades in Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees Motion Hearings - Postdisposition HK Deluxe, LLC's Motion to Determine they are the prevailing party Under Contract and for Order Awarding Attorney's Fees Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling on Defendant HK deluxe, LLc's Motion to Determine that HK Deluxe, LLc is the prevailing party under the contract and for order awarding attorney Fee"s Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Defendant HK Deluxe, LLC's Motion to Determine they are the Prevailing Party Under Contract and for Order Awarding Attorney's Fees and Costs is granted in part. As an initial matter, Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice is granted. The Court finds that Defendant HK Deluxe, LLC is the prevailing party in this action and is entitled to reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. The Court further finds that the declarations and time entries submitted by the Defendants evidence that the time spent on this matter by Dennis Wilson, Justin Berg (both as a paralegal and an attorney), and Analisa Herndon, are reasonable and billed at a reasonable hourly rate. However, in regard to the time of Ronald Melchin, the Court finds that while Mr. Melchin is an attorney, and in fact the attorney that drafted the Lease at issue in this case, he is not counsel of record for Defendant. The Court's interpretation of the attorneys' fees statutes is that the recoverable attorneys' fees are in relation to the attorney or attorneys actually representing the party in the litigation - including all attorneys at the firm. Mr. Melchin appears to have been acting as more of an outside advisor, but Defendant is not entitled to recover fees associated with his services as such. Thus, the Court reduces the award of attorneys' fees by $11,809. Defendant HK Deluxe, LLC is entitled to attorneys' fees in the amount of $119,698.50, plus costs of $1,941.94 pursuant to the Memorandum of Costs filed on September 14, 2021. Counsel for the Defendant shall submit a form of order consistent with this ruling within two weeks |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Proof of Service Proof of Service |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Dennis M Wilson in Support of reply to Opposition to Motion for Order attorney's Fees Declaration |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Electronic Service Proof of Service |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant HK Deluxe Reply to Opposition to Motion for Order of Attorney Fees Reply |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Justin Berg in Support of reply to Opposition to Motion for Order attorney's Fees Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.