Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
City Of Agoura Hills, City Of Angels Camp, City Of Arcadia, City Of Atwater, City Of Beverly Hills, (total of 25) See All filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Churchwell, Steven G, against Ajax, Lori, Bureau Of Cannibas Control, represented by Kapur, Harinder K, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateApril 04, 2019 |
Category39 Unlimited - Other Judicial Review |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 01, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 03, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 06, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 19, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 21, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 14, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 04, 2020Trial brief filed
Date: May 04, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Order Granted
Date: January 14, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: January 30, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: January 30, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 17, 2019Stipulation Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 07, 2020Request for Judical Notice
Date: June 08, 2020Trial brief filed
Date: June 22, 2020Trial brief filed
Date: June 08, 2020Application Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Order Granted
Date: August 06, 2020Trial brief filed
Date: September 21, 2020Opposition filed
Date: September 21, 2020Response filed
Date: September 21, 2020Trial brief filed
Date: October 28, 2020Order filed
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 16, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 17, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: August 03, 2020Stipulation Filed
Date: July 29, 2020Request Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Order Denied
Date: August 04, 2020Request Filed
Date: August 03, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 04, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: August 04, 2020Opposition filed
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 06, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: August 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Reply filed
Date: October 21, 2020Proposed Document filed
Date: August 07, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: August 03, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: August 03, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Request for Judical Notice
Date: June 08, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: April 04, 2019Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Request Filed
Date: May 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order filed on Writ of Mandate Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment and certificate of mailing |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment and certificate of mailing |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Order Received for Signature ***Order signed and entered*** Forwarded to Dept 502 Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter Stipulation/Order to Use Certified Short Hand Reporter Filed Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Taken under advisement | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Mandate
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Introduction of Defendant's "Demonstrative Exhibit A" Notice Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.