Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Gaf Energy, Llc filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Gaf Energy, Martin Debono, represented by Daniel Patrick Martin, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 05, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: October 28, 2020Notice
Date: March 12, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 19, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: February 22, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 20, 2021Response/Reply
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: May 04, 2021Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Request: Dismissal
Date: November 24, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 05, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 10, 2020Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 05, 2021Notice: Entry of Order
Date: March 01, 2021Notice
Date: December 07, 2020Declaration
Date: October 28, 2020Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 30, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: October 28, 2020Declaration
Date: November 03, 2020Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 17, 2020Response/Reply
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 25, 2020Order: Submitted Matter
Date: February 25, 2021Notice
Date: April 16, 2021Hearing: OSC TRO/Preliminary Injunction
Date: August 06, 2019Motion: Quash
Date: September 10, 2019Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration
Date: September 17, 2019Hearing: Demurrer
Date: November 21, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: January 28, 2020Hearing: Motion to Strike
Date: February 13, 2020Motion: Leave to File
Date: July 28, 2020Motion: Strike
Date: July 28, 2020Hearing: Demurrer
Date: July 28, 2020Hearing: Demurrer
Date: September 01, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 15, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: November 10, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: November 24, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: December 17, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: May 04, 2021Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 05, 2021Response/Reply
Date: October 28, 2020Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 01, 2020Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: September 08, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 25, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 15, 2020Order After Hearing - POS
Date: September 30, 2020Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 06, 2020Notice
Date: October 28, 2020Declaration
Date: August 25, 2020Proof of Service
Date: October 28, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: August 19, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: October 16, 2020Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 06, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 31, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 25, 2020Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: August 20, 2020Declaration
Date: August 19, 2020Request
Date: August 19, 2020Proof of Service
Date: August 19, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 14, 2020Declaration
Date: August 14, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: August 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order RE REQUEST TO TEMPORARILY STAY ACTION FOR SIXTY (60) DAYS- Signed by Judge Kirwan |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance for Karan Dhadialla | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Defendant Martin DeBono's Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore re: reporter Joan Coumbini for 5-4-21 - GRANTED by Judge Kirwan |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.