Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Msalam, Andrew, Msalam, Ghassan, Msalam, Jamie, Msalam, Jamilah, Msalam, Jimilah, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Parmenter, Ligia M., against Arellano, Fred, Arellano, Freddie A., Jr, Aria Sarbeland Trust, Does 4-20 Individually And In Their Official Capacities, Does 7-20, Individually And In Their Official Capacities, (total of 10) See All represented by Jabagchourian, Ara R., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2019 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Sarbeland - MPAs mtn to compel
Date: January 12, 2022Sarbeland - POS Mtn to Compl
Date: January 12, 2022Sarbeland - Notice of mtn to compel
Date: January 12, 2022Sarbeland - ARJ decl iso Mtn to cmpl wEx
Date: January 12, 2022Sarbeland - Amended Notice Mtn to Cmpl
Date: January 14, 2022TAC TO FILE 1-24-2022 binder
Date: January 24, 2022Email POS SAC 1-24-2024 Binder3
Date: January 25, 2022Sarbeland - Reply Demuurer wPOS
Date: January 28, 2022Sarbeland - TSC 2.14.22 wPOS
Date: January 28, 20221.28.22 POS
Date: January 29, 20221.28.22 Def Freddie Arellano Concurrence
Date: January 29, 2022POS SAC Endorsed 1-31-2024 Binder
Date: January 31, 2022Errata on SAC's POS 1-31-2022.FILE
Date: January 31, 2022Obj to TSC Stmnt 2-2-2022 Binder
Date: February 02, 2022Sarbeland - CMS 3.14.22 wPOS
Date: February 04, 2022Sarbeland - Proposed Order re demur wPOS
Date: February 08, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 24, 2020Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 30, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: September 11, 2019Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 30, 2019Notice
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 29, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 07, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 27, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: November 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 05, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: February 27, 2020ADR Referral
Date: February 27, 2020Order
Date: October 08, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 10, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 15, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 08, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: January 25, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 25, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: April 07, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 02, 2021Application
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 09, 2021Amendment to Complaint
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: October 12, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: October 26, 2021Fee Waiver Granted
Date: May 10, 2019Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: May 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 30, 2019Notice
Date: September 11, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: April 29, 2021TRIAL SETTING STATEMENT
Date: November 19, 2021Statement
Date: June 04, 2021Demurrer to Amended Complaint
Date: December 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: October 29, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 06, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: December 01, 2021Notice
Date: September 11, 2019Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 05, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 10, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 08, 2021Order
Date: April 09, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 14, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 10, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 15, 2021Amendment to Complaint
Date: November 12, 2021Order
Date: November 18, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 19, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 18, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: September 13, 2021Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: June 25, 2021Motion for Leave to File
Date: August 11, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: September 15, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 07, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 2021TRIAL SETTING STATEMENT
Date: January 28, 2022Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: January 14, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 28, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 25, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 28, 2022Order Denying
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Errata
Date: November 04, 2021Declaration
Date: November 10, 2021ADR Referral
Date: September 28, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Deposition
Date: January 12, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 12, 2022TRIAL SETTING STATEMENT
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: January 31, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 24, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: February 04, 2022Parmenter Decl ISO MPO 3-7-2022
Date: March 07, 2022Mot for Protect Order 3-7-2022
Date: March 07, 2022Julnar Msalam Decl. ISO MP) 3-7-2022
Date: March 07, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 07, 2022Not and Mot for Leave TAC Binder 3-8-2022
Date: March 08, 2022Decl Parmenter ISO TAC Binder
Date: March 08, 2022order
Date: March 08, 2022POS EMAIL Rodriguez
Date: March 16, 2022POS EMAIL Jabagchourian
Date: March 16, 2022POS EMAIL Anaya
Date: March 16, 2022TAC POS FILED 3-16-2022
Date: March 16, 2022Proposed Order Denying 3-21-2022
Date: March 21, 2022Pla Opp to Mot to Compl Dep 3-21-2022
Date: March 21, 2022Decl of Parmetner ISO Opp 3-21-2022
Date: March 21, 2022Objection to Motion final 3-21-2022
Date: March 21, 2022Decl Julnar ISO of Opp 3-21-2022
Date: March 21, 2022Sarbeland - MPAs demurrer 3
Date: March 25, 2022Sarbeland - POS - 3rd Demurrer
Date: March 25, 2022Sarbeland - ARJ Decl Demurrer 3
Date: March 25, 2022Sarbeland - Ntc Demur 3
Date: March 25, 2022Motion to Recuse 3-28-2022
Date: March 28, 2022Parmenter Decl 3-28-2022Binder
Date: March 28, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 28, 2022Sarbeland - POS Reply Mtn to cmpl
Date: March 31, 2022Sarbeland - Reply mtn to cmpl
Date: March 31, 2022POS of Notice 4-8-2022
Date: April 08, 2022NOCD Mot Rec. POS 4-8-2022 Binder
Date: April 08, 2022aa Plnts MTS Def Dem - MTS 5-2-2022
Date: May 02, 2022aa Opp. to MTS 5-2-2022
Date: May 02, 2022aa Opp. to Demurrer 5-2-2022
Date: May 02, 2022Sarbeland - Opp to PO
Date: May 02, 2022Sarbeland - POS re Opp PO
Date: May 02, 2022Sarbeland - ARJ Dec iso Opp PO
Date: May 02, 2022Reply Decl Parmenter
Date: May 06, 2022Reply Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 06, 2022Reply Decl. Juarez
Date: May 06, 2022Compendium Binder FILE
Date: May 06, 2022REPLY Julnar Msalam Print
Date: May 06, 2022Sarbeland - Reply Dmr mts 3 wPOS
Date: May 06, 2022Sarbeland - Obj to Evid re PO wPOS
Date: May 09, 2022Reply to MTS Dem MTS final 5-10-2022
Date: May 10, 2022CMS and TSCS 5-16-2022 FINAL
Date: May 17, 2022Notice to Take Off Cal. 5-17-2022
Date: May 17, 2022Sarbeland - POS TSC 6.6.22
Date: May 19, 2022Sarbeland - 6.6.22 TSC
Date: May 19, 2022Sarbeland - POS 4 Orders
Date: May 19, 2022Proposed Order re Demur 3rd
Date: May 19, 2022Proposed Order re Motion to Compel
Date: May 19, 2022Proposed Order re Motion to Strike Improper
Date: May 19, 2022Proposed Order re Motion to PO and Sanctions
Date: May 19, 2022Fourth Amend. Comp. 6-8-2022 Binder
Date: June 10, 202219-CIV-02602 - Order
Date: June 10, 2022Sarbeland - Notice of Order May 31 wPOS
Date: June 10, 2022Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 24, 2022Second Amended Complaint
Date: February 28, 2022Order
Date: February 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 07, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: March 28, 2022Notice
Date: April 08, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: March 08, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 07, 2022Declaration in Reply
Date: May 06, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: May 02, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 02, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 02, 2022Compendium of Evidence in Support of
Date: May 06, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 28, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 17, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 01, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 19, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 10, 2022Motion to Compel Depositions
Date: May 13, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: March 07, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 07, 2022Motion for Leave to File
Date: March 08, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 08, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: March 21, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: March 21, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 08, 2022Motion
Date: March 28, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 01, 2022Order
Date: May 26, 2022Order
Date: May 26, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: May 13, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: June 09, 2022Objection
Date: March 21, 2022Order
Date: May 26, 2022Demurrer to Amended Complaint
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 07, 2022Third Amended Complaint
Date: March 17, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 06, 2022Motion to Compel Depositions
Date: April 08, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 25, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 02, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: March 15, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 25, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: March 21, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: May 13, 2022Notice
Date: May 17, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 06, 2022Objections to Evidence
Date: May 09, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: May 17, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 02, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: June 10, 2022TRIAL SETTING STATEMENT
Date: May 19, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration in Reply
Date: May 06, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 06, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 19, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 16, 2022Declaration in Reply
Date: May 06, 2022Order
Date: May 26, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: May 02, 2022App Glob Sett Conf 6-14-2022
Date: June 15, 2022FEE WAIVER MSALAM
Date: June 16, 2022App Glob Sett Conf 6-14-2022
Date: June 16, 2022Sarbeland - CMS 8.1.22 wPOS
Date: July 06, 2022Sarbeland - Decl ex time Dmr wPOS
Date: July 06, 2022CMC TSC 8-1-2022 Binder
Date: July 18, 2022Complaint
Date: May 10, 2019First Amended Complaint
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: April 29, 2021Order for Posting
Date: February 28, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: February 26, 2020Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 24, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: January 12, 2022Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 14, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: August 11, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 18, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: October 04, 2021Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: May 10, 2019Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: May 13, 2019Objection
Date: February 02, 2022Order Denying
Date: June 29, 2022Declaration
Date: July 06, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 18, 2022Notice of Hearing re
Date: June 29, 2022Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: June 24, 2022TRIAL SETTING STATEMENT
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Settlement Khalil Msalam
Date: August 25, 2022Dismissal Msalam 9-12-2022
Date: September 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Msalam 9-12-2022 | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Khalil Msalam | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike THE IMPROPERLY JOINTLY FILED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF ARIA SARBELAND AND MARTHA SARBELAND Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike THE IMPROPERLY JOINTLY FILED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF ARIA SARBELAND AND MARTHA SARBELAND Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC TSC 8-1-2022 Binder | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Sarbeland - CMS 8.1.22 wPOS | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Sarbeland - Decl ex time Dmr wPOS | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF ARA JABAGCOURIAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2) REGARDING E Declaration OF ARA JABAGCOURIAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2) REGARDING EXTENDING THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEADLINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.