Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Paycheck, Louis, Sarna, Punit K., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Howard, Elmira R., Kelly, Richard M., against Does 1-30, Inclusive, Sarna, Puja, Sarna, Punit K., represented by Haulk, Matthew A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2019 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
2021.12.20. Proposed Form of Judgment
Date: January 20, 2022Stipulation and Proposed Order
Date: January 20, 2022Proposed Order-Release & Amd Mechanic's Lien
Date: January 20, 2022POS
Date: January 21, 202252555Notic00a524
Date: January 26, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: November 20, 2019Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: October 09, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 11, 2019Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 07, 2019Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: July 26, 2019Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 07, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 09, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 10, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 03, 2020Request
Date: July 22, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 22, 2019Motion for Leave to File
Date: August 22, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 22, 2019Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 23, 2020Notice
Date: July 23, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: January 07, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: August 22, 2019Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: October 09, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: August 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: July 23, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: October 13, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: November 05, 2019Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: September 21, 2020Application For
Date: September 18, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: October 15, 2019First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: October 10, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 05, 2019Notice of Application And Hearing For
Date: September 18, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Hearing re
Date: December 14, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: December 11, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 22, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: December 10, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: December 11, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 11, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: January 13, 2020Objections to Evidence
Date: January 07, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 30, 2020Motion to Compel Further
Date: February 06, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Hearing re
Date: December 23, 2020Order
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief
Date: February 18, 2021Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: January 30, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: April 12, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: January 30, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: March 22, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 10, 2020Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: April 26, 2021Motion for Order
Date: April 26, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 10, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 25, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 17, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: August 03, 2021Motion
Date: August 17, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 10, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: April 10, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 27, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 22, 2020Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: July 23, 2020Jury Trial
Date: August 03, 2020Discovery Conference
Date: October 16, 2020Motion to Compel Further
Date: August 03, 2020Notice of Hearing re
Date: November 04, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Writ of Attachment
Date: November 10, 2020Witness List
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 12, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 09, 2021Trial Setting Conference
Date: February 17, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 19, 2021Trial Brief
Date: April 19, 2021Notice
Date: May 26, 2021Notice
Date: May 26, 2021Pretrial hearing
Date: April 26, 2021Statement of Decision
Date: June 30, 2021Order
Date: March 11, 2021Trial Brief
Date: April 19, 2021Exhibit List
Date: May 26, 2021Order
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Hearing re
Date: May 05, 2021Order
Date: November 16, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 17, 2021Witness List
Date: April 19, 2021Motion for Relief
Date: May 11, 2021Court Trial
Date: May 12, 2021Order
Date: May 06, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 19, 2021Trial Brief
Date: May 21, 2021Request For
Date: May 28, 2021Order
Date: June 07, 2021Notice
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration
Date: August 20, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 28, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: June 10, 2021Supplemental
Date: June 17, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 28, 2021Further Proceedings
Date: May 26, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 07, 2021Notice
Date: June 17, 2021Notice
Date: May 26, 2021Order
Date: January 26, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 29, 2021Supplemental
Date: November 29, 2021Order Denying
Date: December 23, 2021Judgment
Date: January 26, 2022Stipulation
Date: January 20, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: January 21, 2022Objection
Date: June 21, 2021Supplemental
Date: May 21, 2021Objection
Date: June 18, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 18, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 14, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 30, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: September 30, 2021Statement of Decision
Date: June 21, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 20, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: June 24, 2021Motion for Prejudgment Interest
Date: October 26, 2021Order Denying
Date: October 22, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 13, 2021Motion for Order
Date: June 29, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 17, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 17, 2021Motion for Order
Date: August 24, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees
Date: August 17, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 13, 2021Order
Date: September 15, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 30, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 30, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 20, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 30, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: January 26, 2022Motion for Reconsideration
Date: October 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 13, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 20, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 26, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 08, 2021Notice of Hearing re
Date: October 28, 2021Order Denying
Date: December 23, 2021Motion for Order
Date: December 07, 202103-22-2022 Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 22, 202203-22-2022 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: March 22, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: August 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: August 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: June 16, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 03, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 30, 2021Exhibit List
Date: April 19, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 28, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 27, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 21, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: June 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: April 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: June 14, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 29, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 28, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 03, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: July 23, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: November 18, 2021Supplemental
Date: July 22, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: April 10, 2020Complaint
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: August 17, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 18, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 11, 2019Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: July 11, 2019Motion
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: November 20, 2019ADR Referral
Date: November 20, 2019Summons Issued / Filed
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)
Date: May 14, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 22, 2019Cross Complaint
Date: July 11, 2019Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: September 11, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 23, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 10, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: June 17, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 11, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 10, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 11, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: January 07, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: January 07, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 03-22-2022 Memorandum of Costs | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 03-22-2022 Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount:295,242.86 |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | 52555Notic00a524 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Type: RELEASING MECHANIC'S LIEN AND AMENDMENT TO MECHANIC'S LIENSigned by: JUDGE FINEMANDate Order Type: RELEASING MECHANIC'S LIEN AND AMENDMENT TO MECHANIC'S LIEN Signed by: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 01/25/2022 |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment AFTER COURT TRIAL Judgment AFTER COURT TRIAL |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case 22-CIV-00197 Notice of Related Case 22-CIV-00197 |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | POS | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of STIPULATION TO FORM OF JUDGMENT AND FORM OF ORDER TO RELEASE MECHANIC'S Proof of Service by MAIL of STIPULATION TO FORM OF JUDGMENT AND FORM OF ORDER TO RELEASE MECHANIC'S LIEN AND AMENDMENT TO MECHANICS LIEN PROPOSED ORDER- RELEASE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN AND AMENDMENT TO MECHANICS LIEN; ETC... |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | 2021.12.20. Proposed Form of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.