Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Boostcare, Bootup Ventures, Llc, Dial2Buy.Com, Llc, Gaur, Tarun, Jinigram, Llc, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nemecek, David P., Jr, against Dial2Buy.Com, Llc, Does 1-20, Gaur, Tarun, Jinigram, Llc, Kumar, Ravi, (total of 6) See All represented by Akay, Douglas N., Friend, Kathleen B, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreenberg, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management388 days |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2018 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial756 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions247 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement
Date: May 17, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 15, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: May 13, 2019Demurrer to
Date: May 13, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 13, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 07, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Errata
Date: March 08, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 05, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: August 18, 2020Declaration in Reply
Date: October 06, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2019Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: March 11, 2019Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: March 07, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 13, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 21, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 13, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: June 27, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: July 24, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: November 07, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: July 24, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 06, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: August 28, 2020Motion to Compel Further
Date: October 02, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 05, 2020Motion for Leave to File
Date: September 11, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 22, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 16, 2019Answer
Date: December 05, 2019Statement
Date: October 07, 2019Non-Opposition to
Date: October 24, 2019Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: October 31, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 12, 2019Order
Date: November 07, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2019Separate Statement
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: August 04, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 30, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: January 29, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: August 14, 2020Non-Opposition to
Date: September 25, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 30, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 14, 2020Notice
Date: September 30, 2020Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: August 28, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 10, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: January 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 16, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 16, 2021Motion to Compel Further
Date: October 19, 2020Notice
Date: October 09, 2020Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: October 30, 2020Objection
Date: October 14, 2020Order
Date: October 26, 2020Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues
Date: November 13, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 09, 2020Motion for Leave
Date: October 14, 2020Demurrer to
Date: December 11, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 11, 2020Notice
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 03, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 11, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 11, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 30, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: January 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 22, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: May 20, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 10, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: June 10, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: October 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 01, 2021Motion to Compel Further
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: March 02, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 27, 2021Answer
Date: March 26, 2021Demurrer to Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: June 10, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: May 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: May 17, 2021Order
Date: April 07, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 08, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: August 23, 2021Notice
Date: June 10, 2021Notice
Date: May 17, 2021Order
Date: April 07, 2021Second Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: April 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 04, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 26, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 30, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 30, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 14, 2020Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: October 26, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 26, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 30, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: August 04, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 11, 2019Complaint
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 28, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: August 14, 202071752Proof01f67a
Date: March 02, 202371752DECLA000c1d
Date: March 02, 2023Request_for_Dismissal_Jinigram_01
Date: March 06, 2023Request_for_Dismissal_Tarun_01
Date: March 06, 2023Request_for_Dismissal_Dial2Buy_01
Date: March 06, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 13, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 29, 2019Cross Complaint
Date: March 07, 2019Order
Date: August 13, 2019Order
Date: August 13, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Request_for_Dismissal_Jinigram_01 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Request_for_Dismissal_Tarun_01 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Request_for_Dismissal_Dial2Buy_01 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 71752Proof01f67a | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 71752DECLA000c1d | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PORTIONS THEREOF Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference for December 10, 2021 Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference for December 10, 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.