Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
California Renters Legal Advocacy And Education Fund, Fierce, Victoria, Moon, John, San Francisco Bay Area Renters Federation, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case represented by Patterson, Ryan J., against City Of San Mateo, City Of San Mateo Planning Commission, San Mateo City Council, represented by Kautz, Barbara E., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Miram, George A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiram, George A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2018 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions587 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time575 days |
This complaint is a petition for a writ of administrative mandate filed by the San Francisco Bay Area Renters Federation, California Renters Legal Advocacy and Education Fund, Victoria Fierce, and John Moon against the City of San Mateo, San Mateo Ci...
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 23, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: October 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 19, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: August 29, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: April 26, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 12, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 12, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 13, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: July 30, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: May 04, 2020Order Denying
Date: November 07, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 14, 2019Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited
Date: January 10, 2020Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: January 09, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 13, 2019Answer
Date: September 05, 2018Notice
Date: November 25, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: March 19, 2020Stipulation
Date: January 16, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 22, 2020Answer
Date: August 10, 2018Appellant's Notice of Designation
Date: January 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 17, 2019Defendant's Brief re:
Date: October 17, 2019Supplemental
Date: September 19, 2019Stipulation
Date: January 03, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Errata
Date: September 26, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 17, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited
Date: January 24, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 31, 2020Motion for a new trial
Date: January 09, 2020Transmittal of Record on Appeal
Date: February 24, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: January 29, 2020Memorandum of Costs
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: January 13, 2020Remittitur
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 19, 2020Judgment
Date: December 04, 2019Plaintiff's Brief re:
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: December 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remittitur ReversedRemanded for further proceedings Remittitur Reversed Remanded for further proceedings Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONERS' MOTION TO STRIKE,OR ALTER Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONERS' MOTION TO STRIKE,OR ALTERNATELY TO TAX COSTS |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Type: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CALIFORNIA RENTERS LEGAL ADVOCACY AND EDUCATION FUN Order Type: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CALIFORNIA RENTERS LEGAL ADVOCACY AND EDUCATION FUND, VICTORIA FIERCE, AND JOHN MOON'S MOTION TO STRIKE, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO TAX COSTS Signed by: JUDGE MIRAM Date Signed: 8/17/2020 |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received FWD: TO DEPT. 28 Proposed Order Received FWD: TO DEPT. 28 |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Strike 07/30/2020 Motion to Strike OR ALTERNATIVELY TO TAX COSTS Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Added by automated script |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by VIA MAIL AND EMAIL served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 6/9/2020 Proof of Service by VIA MAIL AND EMAIL served on SEE SERVICE LIST with a service date of 6/9/2020 |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to California Renters Legal Advocacy and Education Fund, Victori Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to California Renters Legal Advocacy and Education Fund, Victoria Fierce, and John Moons Re-Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, or Alternatively, to Tax Costs |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike OR ALTERNATIVELY TO TAX COSTS Motion to Strike OR ALTERNATIVELY TO TAX COSTS |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Strike 03/19/2020 Motion to Strike California Renters Legal Advocacy and Education Fund, Victoria Fierce, and John Moon's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, or Alternatively, to Tax Costs Judge: Miram, George A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.