Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bordin, Jeffrey, Martinez, Gregorio, R.C. Wehmeyer Construction, Inc., Wehmeyer, Robert C., Squires, Matthew, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Linn, Peter J., Mengarelli, Michael, against Amercian Contractors Indemnity Company, Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, R.C. Wehmeyer Construction, Inc., Robert C. Wehmeyer Design, Inc., Wehmeyer, Robert C., (total of 5) See All represented by Newcomb, Brian W., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Chou, Danny Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChou, Danny Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2018 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial630 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 25, 2020Motion to Seal Document(s)
Date: September 25, 2020Motion to Seal
Date: November 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 21, 2020Declaration
Date: December 22, 2020Amended Notice Of
Date: October 21, 2020Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: February 26, 2021Notice
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 10, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 26, 2021Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: April 26, 2021Declaration
Date: May 05, 2021Motion to Seal
Date: May 20, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: June 16, 2021Order
Date: June 07, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: April 26, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: March 10, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: October 21, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: October 30, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 09, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 22, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 25, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: March 18, 2019Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: July 27, 2018Separate Statement
Date: June 15, 2018Separate Statement
Date: June 15, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: March 09, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 05, 2019Separate Statement
Date: October 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 04, 2018Declaration
Date: February 15, 2019Cross Complaint
Date: March 14, 2018Declaration in Reply
Date: December 11, 2019Notice
Date: October 30, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 17, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 30, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 27, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: May 31, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: May 31, 2018Motion
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 03, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 09, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 25, 2020Supplemental
Date: August 30, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: May 31, 2018Supplemental
Date: August 30, 2018Complaint
Date: February 20, 2018Order
Date: October 18, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 17, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: November 02, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: May 09, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Opposition
Date: May 08, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: June 01, 2018Supplemental
Date: August 30, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: June 01, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 09, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: May 31, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 21, 2018Declaration
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 27, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 22, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 17, 2020Motion to Enforce the Parties Settlement Agreement
Date: March 24, 2020Order
Date: March 11, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: March 12, 2020Declaration
Date: January 23, 2020Declaration in Reply
Date: March 04, 2020Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: January 28, 2020Declaration
Date: January 17, 2020Declaration in Reply
Date: September 20, 2019Objection
Date: September 20, 2019Motion to Terminate Sanctions
Date: September 27, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 20, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 16, 2019Objection
Date: September 16, 2019Objection
Date: September 16, 2019Objection
Date: September 16, 2019Request
Date: September 16, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 16, 2019Separate Statement
Date: September 16, 2019Separate Statement
Date: August 05, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 05, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 05, 2019Motion
Date: August 05, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 26, 2019Order
Date: May 07, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 07, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: May 07, 2019Order
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration
Date: March 04, 2019Motion to Terminate Sanctions
Date: March 04, 2019Objection
Date: February 25, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 22, 2019Objection
Date: February 22, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 19, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 19, 2019Cross Complaint
Date: February 15, 2019Order
Date: February 15, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 15, 2019Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: February 15, 2019Stipulation
Date: February 15, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: February 15, 2019Separate Statement
Date: January 24, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 24, 2019Motion to Terminate Sanctions
Date: November 20, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: November 28, 2018Answer
Date: November 02, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 30, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Objection
Date: June 27, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: May 23, 2018Answer
Date: April 24, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: May 16, 2018Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: March 14, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: October 30, 2018Order
Date: October 30, 2018Notice
Date: October 10, 2018Motion
Date: October 09, 2018Order Denying
Date: October 01, 2018Order
Date: September 27, 2018Request for Monetary Sanctions
Date: September 27, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 21, 2018Declaration in Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration in Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Supplemental
Date: September 14, 2018Amendment to Complaint
Date: September 11, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 12, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 12, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 12, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 09, 2018Objection
Date: June 27, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Objection
Date: June 27, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 27, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: March 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address of Attorney | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIE ACTION |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ON SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO PERMANENTLY SEAL RECORDS Order ON SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO PERMANENTLY SEAL RECORDS |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Seal 05/20/2021 Motion to Seal SECONDED AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO PERMANENTLY SEAL RECORD [RULE 2.550 AND 2.551] (STIPULATED) Judge: Chou, Danny Y. |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: as modified by the Court |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Defense counsel: Albert M. Finch III |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and or/ video Defense counsel: Albert M. Finch III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.