Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brown, Josie Mae, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Beverly Healthcare-California, Inc., Dycora Transitional Health-Clovis Llc, represented by Beach, David F., Yee, James E., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial791 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions366 days |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time844 days |
This complaint document contains a lot of noise and invalid text from the extraction process. It is difficult to extract any meaningful information from it. There are no dollar amounts or violations of statutes mentioned in this document.
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 16, 2018Amendment filed
Date: April 18, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 02, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 16, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 04, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 19, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: October 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 11, 2018Reply filed
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 20, 2018Reply filed
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: October 11, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 09, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: October 08, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 08, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Statement filed
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 23, 2019Notice Filed
Date: December 20, 2019Notice Filed
Date: December 20, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 06, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 12, 2020Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: July 01, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: October 21, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: July 20, 2020Statement filed
Date: July 20, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 02, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 18, 2020Statement filed
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: November 18, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 24, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 30, 2021Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: April 21, 2021Judgment Received
Date: April 21, 2021ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: May 24, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: November 19, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 24, 2018Order Granted
Date: September 26, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: October 01, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 17, 2018Stipulation Filed
Date: May 24, 2019Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: November 28, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 17, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 10, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 20, 2018Request Filed
Date: October 11, 2018Statement filed
Date: October 01, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 26, 2018Opposition filed
Date: November 13, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: October 01, 2019Opposition filed
Date: November 13, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: November 27, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 21, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 09, 2018Answer Filed
Date: June 18, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 06, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs filed Total Costs: $9,723.75 |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 403 (Proposed) Judgment In Favor of Defendants |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment w/ Order After Hearing & Certificate of Mailing (RE: Summary Judgment) |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & Certificate of Mailing |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Taken Under Submission or Advisement | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Oscar Pardo Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Defendants' Notice of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition To Its Motion for Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.