Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffman, Martin, against Does 1 To 10, Pittella, Rosanna, represented by Tunder, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan L. Greenberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan L. Greenberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions570 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time566 days |
Answer (Limited up to $10,000)
Date: January 08, 2018Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues
Date: December 18, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: June 24, 2019Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: June 24, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: September 17, 2018Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: October 01, 2019Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: September 17, 2018Complaint
Date: December 05, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: September 17, 2018Order
Date: June 27, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 17, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: September 17, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 17, 2018Order
Date: June 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment PURSUANT TO MOTION SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. FWD TO JUDGMENT CLERK Judgment PURSUANT TO MOTION SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. FWD TO JUDGMENT CLERK |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Type: PURSUANT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. FWD Order Type: PURSUANT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. FWD TO JUDGMENT CLERK Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 6-25-19 |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice as to CC-1(b)(3) cause of action for goods sold and delivere Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice as to CC-1(b)(3) cause of action for goods sold and delivered |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer #3 PURSUANT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE AL Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer #3 PURSUANT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Received PURSUANT TO MOTION SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. FWD TO DEPT. #3 Proposed Judgment Received PURSUANT TO MOTION SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. FWD TO DEPT. #3 |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues 12/18/2018 Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for Summary Adjudication Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for Summary Adjudication |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF M Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION Declaration in Support OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.