Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bagga, Surjit, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, Salazar, Margarita, against City National Bank, Fresno Management Company, A California Corporation, Hutchins, Ray, Kruse, James, represented by Slater, G. Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCullers, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management115 days |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category26 Unlimited - Other Real Property |
Time To Trial1592 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time332 days |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 22, 2016Reply filed
Date: January 31, 2017Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: February 07, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: December 22, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 30, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: March 30, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 06, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: December 22, 2016Notice of Motion
Date: March 30, 2017Notice Filed
Date: April 27, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 10, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: March 30, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 30, 2017Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: July 25, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: May 01, 2017Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro
Date: August 17, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 17, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 12, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 12, 2017Reply filed
Date: July 17, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: December 13, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 18, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 20, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 20, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 20, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 19, 2018Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: April 17, 2018Order filed
Date: April 23, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 04, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: June 11, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: June 11, 2018Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: July 19, 2018Reply filed
Date: July 10, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 11, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 30, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 09, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 27, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: March 28, 2019Statement filed
Date: May 15, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 10, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: May 15, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 13, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: January 13, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 20, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 08, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 22, 2016Reply filed
Date: April 10, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: March 30, 2017Request for Judical Notice
Date: March 30, 2017Motion filed
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: February 20, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: March 30, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: October 16, 2016Summons issued and filed
Date: October 18, 2016Civil case cover sheet
Date: October 14, 2016Amended Document Filed
Date: February 24, 2017Opposition filed
Date: January 25, 2017Amended Document Filed
Date: March 22, 2017Proof of Service
Date: December 22, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: March 30, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 30, 2017Proof of Service
Date: March 30, 2017Notice Filed
Date: March 22, 2017Answer Filed
Date: December 22, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 30, 2017Proof of Service
Date: January 25, 2017Opposition filed
Date: July 12, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: July 17, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: August 11, 2017Opposition filed
Date: July 12, 2017Amended Document Filed
Date: August 01, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: August 11, 2017Notice Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: April 28, 2017Opposition filed
Date: July 12, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: December 13, 2017Proof of Service
Date: April 20, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: April 20, 2018Ex parte Filed
Date: April 20, 2018Opposition filed
Date: July 12, 2017Response filed
Date: August 11, 2017Notice Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Notice Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Proof of Service
Date: April 05, 2018Opposition filed
Date: April 05, 2018Proof of Service
Date: June 11, 2018Answer Filed
Date: September 01, 2017Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: September 11, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 11, 2018Opposition filed
Date: July 06, 2018Order after Hearing
Date: December 20, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 18, 2018Response filed
Date: August 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 15, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 15, 2019Proof of Service
Date: May 15, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Service
Date: June 11, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: November 13, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 07, 2020Proof of Service
Date: May 23, 2019Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: June 05, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: September 14, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 22, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Proof of Service
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 02, 2020Proof of Service
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: June 17, 2020Statement filed
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Request Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: January 15, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: January 22, 2020Request Filed
Date: November 04, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 04, 2020Association of Attorney filed
Date: January 22, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 09, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 31, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Service
Date: November 12, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 04, 2020Proof of Service
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Order Granted
Date: July 08, 2020Order Granted
Date: October 29, 2020Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: November 18, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Notice Filed
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: November 03, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: October 26, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 09, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 04, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 18, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Reply filed
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: February 20, 2018Reply filed
Date: April 10, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: October 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Set Aside Judgment Filed 7/13/21 - Susan Keen (FINAL DATE) Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) & CM |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
2/23/23 Fax Received Fax Received **No Action Taken - UNTIMELY. Notice Must be E-filed and Tentative Ruling is Adopted.** Plaintiff's Notice of taking Motion to Vacate Judgment off Calendar. |
|
February 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Surjit Bagga v. City National Bank Superior Court Case No. 16CECG03336 Hearing Date: February 23, 2023 (Dept. 502) Motion: By Plaintiff Surjit Bagga to Vacate Order re Dismissal Tentative Ruling: ... | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Department Change Only - from 403 to 502 |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
10/26/22 Minute Order + cm Minute Order Attachment & CM |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing Specially set hearing on motion to vacate order of dismissal ~ Richard Rogan Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall Atty Arielle Brown for Defendant |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
10/25/22 Ex Parte Application ~ Hearing 10/26/22 Ex parte Filed Hearing 10/26/22 ~ Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
10/25/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 10/26/22 Declaration Filed Arielle Brown |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.