Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Funding Llc Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Amazon, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cork, Patrick C., Kanu-Oji, Francisca, Winter, Robert A., against Deems, Darren, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Richard M. Cowart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard M. Cowart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2023 |
CategoryGarnishment* |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeCollections |
This complaint is a legal case filed in the Superior Court of Lowndes County, Georgia. The plaintiff, Midland Funding LLC, is seeking a garnishment against the defendant, Darren Deems. The plaintiff's attorney states that they obtained a judgment aga...
Entry of Appearance
Date: December 11, 2023Order
Date: December 08, 2023Motion
Date: December 07, 2023Service
Date: October 19, 2023Notice
Date: November 27, 2023Miscellaneous
Date: October 19, 2023Service
Date: December 07, 2023Summons
Date: October 19, 2023Complaint & Affidavit
Date: October 19, 2023Notice
Date: November 27, 2023Proposed Order
Date: December 07, 2023Return Sheriffs Service
Date: October 26, 2023Miscellaneous
Date: November 20, 2023Notice
Date: October 19, 2023Entry of Appearance
Date: December 11, 2023Miscellaneous
Date: December 07, 2023Miscellaneous
Date: December 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance EOA: Patrick Cork |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Deft Claim Form Judge: Cowart, Richard M. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
LOWNDES-DEEMS-MOTION MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
LOWNDES-DEEMS-COS Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
LOWNDES-DEEMS-PO Proposed Order |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
LOWNDES-DEEMS-PO Miscellaneous PROPOSED ORDER |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
LOWNDES-DEEMS-COS Miscellaneous CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 12.11.23 (Plaintiff's firm) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.