Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Reid, Katy Elizabeth, against Pirozzi, Alexander Michael, represented by Hogan, Tiffany Anna, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with MIRMAN, LAWRENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMIRMAN, LAWRENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT
Date: August 01, 2022JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )
Date: October 05, 2021JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4698.689 / 4934080) ( V )
Date: October 06, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )
Date: September 28, 2021RETURN MAIL
Date: August 23, 2022SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )
Date: September 28, 2021UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC
Date: October 05, 2021COURT MINUTES ( V )
Date: September 28, 2021CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4698.698 / 4934083) ( V )
Date: October 06, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )
Date: October 05, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )
Date: August 18, 2021IN-COURT NOTES
Date: September 28, 2021WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )
Date: June 04, 2021INFORMATION ( V )
Date: May 25, 2021APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )
Date: May 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )
Date: May 12, 2021FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )
Date: May 10, 2021ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )
Date: May 10, 2021ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )
Date: May 10, 2021NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: May 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 08/23/2022 | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 08/23/2022 - FAILED TO PAY $1212.08 | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUMMARY | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney KATY ELIZABETH REID - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4698.689 / 4934080) ( V ) | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4698.698 / 4934083) ( V ) | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.