Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sea Coast National Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Alonzo, Edmond, Cohen, Marc B, against City Of Port St Lucie, Foster, Kevin, Mackin, Thomas, Mackin, Yvonne, Unk Sp Kevin Foster, (total of 6) See All represented by Grazi, Ryan S, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with METZGER, ELIZABETH A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2010 |
CategoryNonhomestd Mf $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: November 19, 2010MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME:TO FILE RESP TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2010MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: September 24, 2010ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS:DENYING
Date: November 02, 2010ANSWER
Date: December 10, 2010PLTF REPLY TO AFFIRM DEFENSES
Date: March 07, 2011ANSWER:THOMAS MACKIN
Date: June 20, 2011ORDER GRANT MTN TO WITHDRAW
Date: June 08, 2011AFFIDAVIT-SUPPORT SUMMARY JDGT
Date: June 20, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT DEFICIENCY - Recorded (OR.3704.1507 / 4027784)
Date: January 02, 2015MOTION FOR DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT
Date: June 20, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT DEFICIENCY
Date: January 02, 2015MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: February 04, 2015VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL-GARNISHMNT
Date: March 13, 2015NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )
Date: March 09, 2017MOTION FOR CONT WRIT GARNISHMENT ( V )
Date: September 17, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE IN AID OF EXECUTION ( V )
Date: October 14, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )
Date: November 22, 2019ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL-GRANTED; ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION-DENIED ( V )
Date: January 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V ) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL-GRANTED; ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION-DENIED ( V ) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE ( V ) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 01/09/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000099749 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 99307665 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191202235959.TXT. | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL ( V ) | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN CASE - MOTION TO COMPEL | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney MARC B COHEN - Deactivated by Automated Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.