Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
East Lake Woodlands Community Association Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Brandon K Mullis, Esq, against Kearney, Cari, Kearney, Kevin Charles, Larson, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property - County |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is filed by the East Lake Woodlands Community Association, Inc. against Kevin Charles Kearney, Cari Kearney, and unknown tenant(s). The plaintiff is a not-for-profit Florida corporation and serves as the homeowner's association for Eas...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 9 ISSUED Party: KEARNEY, KEVIN CHARLES
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 8 ISSUED Party: LARSON, JUSTIN
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 7 ISSUED Party: KEARNEY, CARI
Date: December 31, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 5
Date: December 31, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 4 C CERTIFIED LETTER REGARDING CLAIM OF LIEN
Date: December 31, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 3 B CLAIM OF LIEN FOR UNPAID ASSESSMENTS
Date: December 31, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 2 A MASTER DECLARATION OF COVENANTS AND RESTRICTIONS
Date: December 31, 2019COMPLAINT Doc # 1
Date: December 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 11 011020 F/K/A UNKNOWN TENANTS Party: LARSON, JUSTIN
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 10 011020 Party: KEARNEY, CARI
Date: January 15, 2020ANSWER OF Doc # 12 Party: KEARNEY, CARI Party: LARSON, JUSTIN
Date: January 29, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 21 F - AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: February 05, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 20 G - PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT OF FEES
Date: February 05, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 16 A - NOTICE OF INTENT TO RECORD A CLAIM OF LIEN
Date: February 05, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 19 D - AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM
Date: February 05, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 17 B - CLAIM OF LIEN FOR UNPAID ASSESSMENTS
Date: February 05, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 15
Date: February 05, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 14 04062020 9:45 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: February 05, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 13 FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Date: February 05, 2020ORDER Doc # 22 PERMITTING PLTFS COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY 04/06/2020 9:45
Date: February 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Doc # 26 Party: KEARNEY, KEVIN CHARLES
Date: February 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Doc # 23
Date: February 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Doc # 25 Party: KEARNEY, KEVIN CHARLES
Date: February 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Doc # 24 W/ATTACHMENT Party: KEARNEY, KEVIN CHARLES
Date: February 20, 2020PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 29 30 DAYS
Date: March 13, 2020FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 33 $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE DUE/EMAILED ON 4/20/20
Date: April 20, 2020ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 32
Date: April 20, 2020NOTICE OF ACTION Doc # 27 ISSUED Party: KEARNEY, KEVIN CHARLES
Date: February 28, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Doc # 31 Vol./Book 20972, Page 1615, 5 pages
Date: April 20, 2020NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 34
Date: April 22, 2020FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 39 OUTSTANDING $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE(EMAILED 11/19/20)
Date: November 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 39 OUTSTANDING $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE(EMAILED 11/19/20)
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURT SALE CANCELLED PER JUDGE MCCNARY
Judge: ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING (R) Doc # 38 PLTF MOTN TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT/CANCEL SALE/DISMISS ACTION AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 21027, Page 314, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 37
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE Doc # 36 FINAL JUDGMENT, CANCEL THE JUDICIAL SALE, DISMISS THIS ACTION AND RELEASE THE LIS PENDENS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Doc # 35
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 34
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 33 $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE DUE/EMAILED ON 4/20/20
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 32
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Doc # 31 Vol./Book 20972, Page 1615, 5 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.