Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Le Scampi Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Theresa L Donovan, against Any And All Unknown Parties, Sherman, Toni J, represented by Matthew D Weidner, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property Other2 - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
EXHIBIT Doc # 8 B AMENDED CLAIM OF LIEN
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 50
Date: June 23, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 14 A - AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGES
Date: March 23, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 7 A DECLARATION OF CONDOMINIUM
Date: December 29, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 6
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 4 ISSUED Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 9 011518 Party: SHERMAN, TONI J
Date: January 26, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: SHERMAN, TONI J
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Doc # 10 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: January 26, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Doc # 11 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: January 26, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 15 050318 3:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: March 30, 2018SUBPOENA TO BE ISSUED - FEE REQUIRED Doc # 44 ISSUED
Date: March 28, 2019NOTICE TO SET CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL Doc # 32
Date: October 02, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 33 110918 1:30
Date: October 25, 2018ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE Doc # 38 020618 10:45
Date: December 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 22 092518 10:45
Date: July 02, 2018CERTIFICATE Doc # 40 OF SERVICE OF COPY ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 19, 2018ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 30 TO AMENDED COMPLAINT Party: SHERMAN, TONI J
Date: September 21, 2018AMENDED Doc # 39 ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGAMENT CONFERENCE 020619 10:30
Date: December 19, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 29 AND EMAIL DESIGNATION Party: SHERMAN, TONI J
Date: September 21, 2018PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 36
Date: November 07, 2018ORDER Doc # 41 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE --- NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: February 06, 2019ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Doc # 31
Date: September 26, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 26 ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 25 ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT OF DISINTERESTED ATTORNEY AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: September 17, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 24 A - TRANSACTION HISTORY
Date: August 16, 2018SUBPOENA FOR DEPO Doc # 43 FROM NONPARTY (SIGNED)
Date: March 27, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 27 AFFIDAVIT OF TONI J. SHERMAN
Date: September 21, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 46 072319 2:00
Date: May 03, 2019NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 37 --- IMPASSE
Date: November 19, 2018ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 34 --- COURT RECEIVED 103018
Date: October 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT Doc # 28 IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2018NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 47 OF HEARING 072319 2:00
Date: July 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN)
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 50
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 49
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 48
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 47 OF HEARING 072319 2:00
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 47OF HEARING 072319 2:00 | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 46 072319 2:00
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 46072319 2:00 | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 45 BY PLTF OF SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF SHERRY DERUZZO IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT W/ EXHIBITS (ATTACHED)
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.