Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Otero-Rivera, Christopher J, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with CARSTEN, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARSTEN, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 216 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
STATUS HEARING CANCELLED REMAINS AS SET FOR MOTION TO SUPPRESS/ PRE-TRIAL (PER EMAIL)
Date: September 24, 2020PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: September 30, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: September 23, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: October 02, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY #21
Date: September 16, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #20
Date: September 11, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING- STATUS HEARINGS RE: OCTOBER MOTION HEARINGS
Date: September 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING- STATUS HEARING RE: OCTOBER MOTION HEARINGS
Date: September 15, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: September 02, 2020E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 10, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #19
Date: September 01, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 19, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: August 18, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #18
Date: August 25, 2020ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S SUBPONEA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: August 14, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: August 12, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #17
Date: August 11, 2020PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: August 12, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #16
Date: August 04, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING ON JUNE 17, 2020
Date: August 03, 2020MOTION FOR COURT REPORTER TO TRANSCRIBE NOTES
Date: July 27, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #15
Date: July 22, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 22, 2020REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND REQUEST TO BE EXCUSED FROM PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: August 10, 2020ORDER ON STATE'S MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPTION OF HEARING PROCEEDINGS
Date: July 31, 2020CASE RESET FOR PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL (PER EMAIL)
Date: July 07, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #14
Date: July 01, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: July 01, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #13
Date: June 23, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION AND WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO SUPPRESS (TO BE RESCHEDULED)
Date: June 24, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: June 25, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBITS RECEIVED INTO EVIDENCE - MOTION HEARING (2 PAGES / ENVELOPES)
Date: June 17, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION
Date: June 19, 2020EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT (CLERK TO JUDGE)
Date: June 17, 2020EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT (CLERK TO VAULT)
Date: June 17, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: June 15, 2020EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT (VAULT TO CLERK)
Date: June 17, 2020NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 13, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #12
Date: June 11, 2020STATE'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: June 10, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: June 09, 2020ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Date: June 11, 2020NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 06, 2020AMENDEND NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 06, 2020STATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT "ADOPTIVE ADMISSIONS"
Date: June 08, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 05, 2020PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: June 05, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #11
Date: June 04, 2020TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: June 05, 2020E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: June 03, 2020ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Date: June 03, 2020ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Date: June 03, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING- STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: June 03, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: May 29, 2020DEFENSE MOTION FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE "SANPCHAT" RECORDS
Date: June 02, 2020AMENDED MOTION FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE "GPS" RECORDS
Date: June 03, 2020STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: May 28, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: May 29, 2020STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PHOTOGRAPHS
Date: May 28, 2020AMENDED DEFENSE WITNESS LIST
Date: May 29, 2020RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CELL SITE MAPPING
Date: May 28, 2020DEFENSE MOTION FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE EMAIL COMMUNICATIONS
Date: May 26, 2020DEFENSE MOTION FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE "SNAP CHAT" RECORDS
Date: May 26, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: May 26, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #10
Date: May 25, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: May 22, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PHOTOGRAPHS
Date: May 17, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: May 20, 2020REQUEST TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT PRE-TRIAL
Date: May 21, 2020DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: May 17, 2020MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION
Date: May 17, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CELL GRAPH RECONSTRUCTION MAPS
Date: May 17, 2020MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE IN AN UNLAWFUL SEARCH AND SEIZURE
Date: May 17, 2020DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS ILLEGALLY OBTAINED
Date: May 17, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY ON CERTIFIED RECORDS
Date: May 15, 2020E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: May 13, 2020STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PROVIDE DNA FILE, BENCH NOTES, AND ELECTRONIC DATA
Date: May 12, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHBIT #9
Date: May 11, 2020STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING WITNESS OPINION ON GUILT
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: May 01, 2020ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED ON AMENDED INFORMATION FILED
Date: April 30, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #8
Date: April 28, 2020NOTICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT DISCOVERY RULE
Date: April 29, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: April 27, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #7
Date: April 21, 2020SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED
Date: April 14, 2020DEFENSE WITNESS LIST
Date: April 14, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #6
Date: April 14, 2020AMENDED INFORMATION FILED
Date: April 20, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: April 13, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: April 11, 2020PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL RESET BY THE COURT
Date: April 09, 2020MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: April 03, 2020DESIGNATION OF ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY
Date: March 31, 2020MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPTION OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Date: March 31, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #5
Date: March 23, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: March 18, 2020PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL RESET BY THE COURT
Date: March 16, 2020STATE OF FLORIDA'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: March 20, 2020E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: March 16, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #3
Date: March 20, 2020ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S AMENDED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Date: March 16, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #4
Date: March 16, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #2
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING- MOTION TO COMPEL FINGERPRINTS
Date: March 09, 2020MOTION TO COMPEL FINGERPRINTS (BLANK ORDER ATTACHED)
Date: March 09, 2020STATE'S RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING- MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 09, 2020MOTION FOR STATMENT OF PARTICULARS (NO BLANK ORDER)
Date: March 08, 2020INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET
Date: March 06, 2020FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.
Date: March 06, 2020DESIGNATION OF ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY
Date: March 06, 2020CAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: March 06, 2020INDICTMENT FILED:
Date: March 05, 2020TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: February 24, 2020CAPIAS ISSUED
Date: March 05, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #1
Date: February 24, 2020REPORTER'S ACKNOWLEDGMENT
Date: December 30, 2021ELECTRONIC APPEAL FILING CONFIRMATION PAGE(S)
Date: January 11, 2022CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Date: December 28, 2021CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Date: December 27, 2021DIRECTIONS TO CLERK
Date: December 27, 2021DESIGNATION TO COURT REPORTER
Date: December 27, 2021CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Date: December 21, 2021ORDER OF THE COURT (5TH DCA) GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: December 22, 2021ELECTRONIC APPEAL FILING CONFIRMATION PAGE(S)
Date: December 20, 2021ELECTRONIC APPEAL FILING CONFIRMATION PAGE(S)
Date: December 17, 2021COVER SHEET AND INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: December 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CLERK
Date: December 14, 2021DESIGNATION OF A PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: December 17, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: December 14, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: December 13, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: December 14, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: December 13, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: December 08, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: December 08, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RECORD
Date: November 17, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING ON MARCH 25, 2021
Date: October 29, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: October 28, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF SENTENCING HEARING ON JULY 21, 2021
Date: October 29, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: September 29, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING ON MARCH 12, 2021
Date: October 29, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: September 29, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF CONTINUATION OF MOTION TO SUPPRESS HEARING ON DECEMBER 9, 2020
Date: October 29, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: October 28, 2021ORDER OF THE COURT (5TH DCA) GRANTING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME
Date: August 17, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT - EXH #95-USB DRIVE
Date: August 13, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: August 13, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: August 11, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: August 09, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: August 11, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: August 10, 2021COURT REPORTER'S ACKNOWLEDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2021EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT
Date: August 09, 2021EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT
Date: August 10, 2021ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: August 03, 2021ELECTRONIC APPEAL FILING CONFIRMATION PAGE(S)
Date: August 02, 2021ELECTRONIC APPEAL FILING CONFIRMATION PAGE(S)
Date: August 03, 2021MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPTION OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: July 30, 2021DIRECTIONS TO CLERK
Date: July 30, 2021DESIGNATION TO COURT REPORTER
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL TO CIRCUIT COURT
Date: July 30, 2021AMENDED FELONY SENTENCE ORDER - RECORDED (OR.6007.2459. / 2021113904)
Date: July 22, 2021STATEMENT OF JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED
Date: July 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF COSTS IMPOSED - RECORDED (OR.6010.291. / 2021115698)
Date: July 23, 2021CERTIFICATE OF COSTS IMPOSED - RECORDED (OR.6009.15. / 2021114883)
Date: July 23, 2021ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER FOR APPEAL PURPOSES
Date: July 21, 2021APPLICATION FOR INDIGENCY STATUS - FOR APPEAL PURPOSES ONLY
Date: July 21, 2021DOC SENTENCE
Date: July 21, 2021RESTITUTION ORDER/NAME AND ADDRESS OF VICTIM
Date: July 21, 2021FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT
Date: July 21, 2021DOC PACKET
Date: July 21, 2021FELONY SENTENCE ORDER - RECORDED (OR.6007.812. / 2021113471)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBITS ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE (LISTED FORMAT)
Date: April 30, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: July 21, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF SENTENCING
Date: April 29, 2021NOTICE OF SENTENCING
Date: April 28, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: July 21, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #38
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBITS ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE
Date: April 30, 2021VERDICT: COUNT 3
Date: April 21, 2021VERDICT: COUNT 1
Date: April 21, 2021JURY INSTRUCTIONS, FILED IN OPEN COURT
Date: April 21, 2021VERDICT: COUNT 2
Date: April 21, 2021JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FILINGS IN 49-2018-CF-3804-O
Date: April 19, 2021STIPULATION OF FACT AS TO ITEMS RECOVERED FROM HIXON
Date: April 20, 2021STATE'S REQUEST FOR SECOND SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION
Date: April 18, 2021PRAECIPE FOR SUBPOENA
Date: April 19, 2021TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: April 16, 2021SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: April 19, 2021FELONY COURT MINUTES/ORDER JURY TRIAL TO CONTINUE TOMORROW
Date: April 15, 2021INTERPRETER REQUEST FORM
Date: April 13, 2021NOTE FROM THE COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF EVIDENCE
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER ON MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION OF COST
Date: April 08, 2021SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: April 06, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: April 08, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENSE WITNESS LIST
Date: April 06, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVER EXHIBIT #37
Date: April 07, 2021PRAECIPE FOR SUBPOENA
Date: April 06, 2021PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT OF THE CASE FOR JURY PUBLICITY QUESTIONS
Date: April 05, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST
Date: April 06, 2021MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF COSTS
Date: April 02, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: March 31, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #36
Date: March 30, 2021PRAECIPE FOR SUBPOENA
Date: April 01, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENSE WITNESS LIST
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBITS ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE
Date: March 26, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: March 29, 2021TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: March 25, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING- VARIOUS STATE & DEFENSE PRETRIAL MOTIONS
Date: March 24, 2021TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: March 24, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #35
Date: March 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING- VARIOUS STATE & DEFENSE PRETRIAL MOTIONS
Date: March 23, 2021SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: March 23, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENSE WITNESS LIST
Date: March 22, 2021STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON SUMMARY PURSUANT TO 90.956
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: March 23, 2021PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 19, 2021REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: March 17, 2021STATE'S REQUEST FOR SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 21, 2021EXHIBITS ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE
Date: March 22, 2021REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF BOND PAPERWORK
Date: March 17, 2021SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: March 17, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #34
Date: March 15, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: March 10, 2021DEFENDANT'S RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY
Date: March 12, 2021MOTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY
Date: March 15, 2021PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: March 12, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #32
Date: March 10, 2021STATE'S RESPONSE & OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Date: March 08, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #33
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 05, 2021WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: January 20, 2021FELONY COURT MINUTES/ORDER CASE SET FOR ARRAIGNMENT ON SECOND AMENDED INFORMATION FILED
Date: January 14, 2021EXECUTIVE ORDER NUMBER 21-08
Date: January 13, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #30
Date: January 14, 2021MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 02, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #31
Date: February 25, 2021SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: January 13, 2021PRAECIPE FOR SUBPOENA
Date: January 12, 2021AMENDED DEFENSE WITNESS LIST
Date: January 12, 2021DESIGNATION OF ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING- STATUS HEARING
Date: January 06, 2021SECOND AMENDED INFORMATION
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER ON STATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT "ADOPTIVE ADMISSIONS"
Date: December 29, 2020EVIDENCE CHECK-OUT RECEIPT EVIDENCE RETURNED RECEIPT (JUDGE TO CLERK)
Date: December 30, 2020ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE IN AN UNLAWFUL SEARCH AND SEIZURE
Date: December 29, 2020EXHIBITS ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE
Date: December 09, 2020CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET - DIVISON 101
Date: December 14, 2020DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING
Date: December 07, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #29
Date: December 02, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #28
Date: November 24, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #26
Date: November 10, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: October 15, 2020NOTICE OF RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY
Date: October 21, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #25
Date: October 26, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #27
Date: November 16, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: October 14, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #24
Date: October 14, 2020EXHIBITS RECEIVED INTO EVIDENCE - MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Date: October 22, 2020FELONY COURT MINUTES/ORDER CASE SET FOR REMAINDER OF MOTION TO SUPPRESS HEARING (PER E-MAIL)
Date: October 26, 2020PRAECIPE FOR SUBPOENA
Date: October 13, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: October 13, 2020PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: October 09, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #23
Date: October 08, 2020NOTICE OF PROVISONAL SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY
Date: October 04, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: October 02, 2020MOTION TO SUPPRESS HEARING CANCELLED CASE SET PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (PER EMAIL)
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: October 05, 2020AMENDED MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE IN AN UNLAWFUL SEARCH AND SEIZURE
Date: October 06, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #22
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2051 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2038 | Docket Event | ||
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.