Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mitchell, Lamar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ginley Lawn Service & Landscaping Inc, Miami-Dade County, represented by Frastai, Daniel, Harney, Niva Maria, Hermida, Andres, Ramos-Barreau, Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a motion for leave to amend an amended complaint in a slip and fall case that occurred near a bus stop in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The plaintiff, Lamar Mitchell, is seeking to add another defendant, Ginley Lawn Service & Landscap...
Request for Production
Date: November 18, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: October 09, 2020Motion to Tax Cost
Date: October 26, 2020Agreed Order
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Appeal
Date: October 19, 2020Final Judgment for Defendant by Judge
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: October 09, 2020Subpoena
Date: October 22, 2020Response:
Date: September 22, 2020Motion for Clarification
Date: November 05, 2020Summary Final Judgment
Date: October 01, 2020Request for Production
Date: September 08, 2020Request for Copies
Date: August 24, 2020Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena
Date: August 12, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: March 30, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: April 01, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: March 27, 2020Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: May 05, 2020Order:
Date: December 15, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: February 24, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 23, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: May 05, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: March 24, 2020Response to Motion
Date: January 20, 2021Order:
Date: October 22, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 16, 2020Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: September 24, 2020Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: June 11, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: March 25, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: May 29, 2020Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: January 22, 2020Request for Production
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 24, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 13, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: March 20, 2020Motion:
Date: November 12, 2019Request for Production
Date: November 18, 2019Request for Copies
Date: March 02, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: March 19, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 07, 2019Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: September 25, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: June 25, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: June 19, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: March 18, 2020Mot to File Amended Complaint
Date: November 04, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 18, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: June 17, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: June 14, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: June 12, 2019Objection:
Date: October 21, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: September 30, 2019Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: October 17, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: October 14, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: June 11, 2019Request:
Date: October 18, 2019Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: October 10, 2019Mediators Report
Date: October 09, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: October 07, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: October 03, 2019Notice of Production
Date: September 30, 2019Subpoena Served
Date: June 07, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena
Date: May 30, 2019Answer
Date: May 10, 2019Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 11, 2019Request for Production
Date: March 22, 2019Request for Production
Date: May 16, 2019Complaint
Date: March 22, 2019Motion for Attorneys Fees
Date: January 04, 2022Order:
Date: December 08, 2021Order:
Date: October 14, 2021Order:
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Filing:
Date: October 11, 2021Notice:
Date: April 21, 2021Deposition Transcript
Date: August 16, 2021Order:
Date: February 22, 2021Response to Motion
Date: October 08, 2021Mandate From Appeals Court
Date: December 28, 2021Order:
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: August 06, 2021Order for Setting Hearing
Date: February 16, 2021Motion for Attorneys Fees
Date: February 24, 2021Response to Motion
Date: April 21, 2021Cancellation Notice
Date: February 09, 2021Deposition Transcript
Date: January 20, 2021Deposition Transcript
Date: January 20, 2021Notice of Unavailability/absence
Date: November 10, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 19, 2020Witness List
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Interrogatory
Date: September 08, 2020Notice:
Date: May 05, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 11, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: December 30, 2020Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: December 04, 2020Witness List
Date: November 24, 2020Motion for Attorneys Fees
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Filing:
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: September 30, 2020Exhibit List
Date: January 05, 2021Cancellation Notice
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Filing:
Date: January 20, 2021Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: December 29, 2020Exhibit List
Date: January 05, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Interrogatory
Date: November 18, 2020Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 22, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: October 08, 2020Notice:
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 02, 2020Notice of Interrogatory
Date: November 30, 2020Witness List
Date: November 30, 2020Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2020Notice:
Date: July 16, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Compliance
Date: July 13, 2020Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 23, 2020Order Setting Jury Trial
Date: May 16, 2020Notice of Filing:
Date: May 05, 2020Notice of Interrogatory
Date: May 28, 2020Certificate of No Objections to Production
Date: August 13, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: July 27, 2020Order Setting Management Conference
Date: April 10, 2020Notice:
Date: May 04, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 23, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: October 26, 2020Motion for Relief from Judgment
Date: October 06, 2020Objection:
Date: November 30, 2020Subpoena Served
Date: August 19, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: May 05, 2020Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: May 07, 2020Request for Production
Date: November 30, 2020Order:
Date: November 27, 2019Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: June 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorneys Fees Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandate From Appeals Court (AFFIRMED) (3D20-1520) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: 3RD DCA ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, ETC., Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: 3RD DCA ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL (3D20-1520) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS IS GRANTED AS TO ENTITLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: DEFENDANT, GINLEY LAWN SERVICE & LANDSCAPING, INC. S SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 11, 2021 | Hearing |
Special Sets GINLEY LAWN SERVICE & LANDSCAPING, INC'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Deposition Transcript Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: 3RD DCA ORDER DETERMINING THAT CONDENSED TRANSCRIPTS FAIL TO COMPLY WITH THE REQUIREMENTS, ETC., Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.