Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Loandepotcom Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ullman, Zachary Y, against Rainbow Springs Property Owner, Sponagle, Cheryl, Sponagle, James, Sponagle, Tyler, Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries De, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 19, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: November 19, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 20, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHERYL SPONAGLE
Date: December 20, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RAINBOW SPRINGS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC
Date: December 20, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UKNOWN TENANT 1 NKA TYLER SPONAGLE
Date: December 20, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2 NKA JAMES SPONAGLE
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH
Date: December 23, 2019RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT CHERYL SPONAGLE
Date: December 27, 2019EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: December 23, 2019NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILING/ATTORNEY COPY
Date: December 30, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOT.COM
Date: February 03, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOT.COM LLC
Date: February 12, 2020CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE
Date: February 18, 2020ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTON FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: February 18, 2020CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: PROOF OF PUBLICATION DATES
Date: February 21, 2020DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 04, 2020ANSWER OF AD LITEM
Date: March 04, 2020CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE
Date: March 20, 2020ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 16, 2021AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOT COM LLC
Date: October 07, 2021ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: October 29, 2021CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY PLTF
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PLTF FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PLTF MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2021EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 15, 2021ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: December 22, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 30, 2021RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT BEATRIZ I TRIPP
Date: January 24, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT BEATRIZ I TRIPP ON 01.12.2022
Date: January 25, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT JOE TRIPP ON 01.12.2022
Date: January 25, 2022EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC
Date: January 27, 2022EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: January 27, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY JOE TRIPP FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC
Date: January 27, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BEATRIZ I TRIPP
Date: January 27, 2022EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT
Date: January 27, 2022EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT AMENDED
Date: January 27, 2022ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: February 09, 2022ORDER OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORDS AT TRIAL
Date: February 15, 2022EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC
Date: February 15, 2022WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC
Date: February 15, 2022WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOT COM LLC
Date: February 17, 2022DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 19, 2019RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: November 19, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOT COM LLC | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORDS AT TRIAL | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING NON JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING NON JURY TRIAL | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF LOANDEPOTCOM LLC | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.