Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tiaa Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Bank Of America Na, Beltzer, David G, Beltzer Harper, Debora Ann, Beltzer, Irene Mary, Unknown Parties In Possession, (total of 7) See All represented by Allen, Andrea Kathryn, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EFILED SUMMONS
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME
Date: January 22, 2021MOTION-MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: March 30, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: May 24, 2021AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2021EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: June 08, 2021INVOICE
Date: June 10, 2021RECEIPT
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: June 18, 2021RECEIPT FOR EXTRA PARTIES
Date: June 30, 2021COPY OF: INVOICE
Date: June 28, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING
Date: August 31, 2021MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: August 24, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED JUNE 8 2021
Date: August 19, 2021ANSWER FILED BY STEPHEN L BELTER SR
Date: July 22, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: September 09, 2021EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: August 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF IRENE MARY BELTZER ON JULY 24TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT WILLIAM EDWARD BELTZER ON JULY 26TH 2021
Date: September 23, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL BERNARD BELTZER ON JULY 14TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FREDERICK BERNARD BELTZER JR ON JULY 21ST 2021
Date: September 23, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ALAN JOSEPH BELTZER ON AUGUST 2ND 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BIRTRAM ARTHUR BELTZER ON AUGUST 12TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR FREDERICK BERNARD BELTZER JR JULY 21ST 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MICHAEL BERNARD BELTZER ON JULY 14TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEBORA ANN BELTZER HARPER AKA DEBORA A BELTZER ON AUGUST 11TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SHEILA JEANNE WEYANT ON JULY 16TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH
Date: August 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR REBECCA R GAGNE ON JULY 15TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR IRENE MARY BELTZER ON JULY 24TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 16, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHEILA JEANNE WEYANT ON JULY 16TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT FILED FOR DEFTS UNKNOWN HEIRS CONT SEE DOC
Date: November 01, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM EDWARD BELTZER ON JULY 26TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEPHEN L BELTZER ON JULY 15TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALETA R BELTZER FROST NKA JAMES W FROST
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF REBECCA R GAGNE ON JULY 15TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: September 29, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: October 01, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ALETA R BELTZER FROST AKA ALETA FROST ON JULY 15TH 2021
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: October 18, 2021ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 03, 2022NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER UPON PLTFS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT
Date: January 04, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN HEIRS CONT SEE DOC
Date: November 01, 2021ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: October 29, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: January 25, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: March 23, 2022ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: December 23, 2021MOTION-MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PLTFS COUNCIL FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: March 23, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: December 08, 2021ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING
Date: March 31, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE FILE DBY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: January 31, 2022MOTION-MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF FILING EFILED LOAN DOCUMENT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: March 30, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: February 04, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 12, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 12, 2019RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: November 12, 2019NOTICE
Date: November 12, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 14, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DAVID G BELTZER
Date: November 20, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID G BELTZER 11.15.19
Date: November 21, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BANK OF AMERICA NA
Date: November 20, 2019DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: August 31, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA
Date: December 04, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2
Date: November 21, 2019EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: August 27, 2020EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: November 12, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 12, 2019ANSWER FILED BY DEFT BANK OF AMERICA NA
Date: December 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: August 27, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: April 09, 2021MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED PER PLTF TIAA FSB
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING EFILED LOAN DOCUMENT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLTFS COUNCIL FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE FILE DBY PLTF TIAA FSB | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLTF TIAA FSB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.