Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Treasure Island Cafe, Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Ford, Troy A, Skylark-Schippers, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 23, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: September 10, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED CONT SEE DOC
Date: October 12, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SCHIPPERS JAY ME
Date: October 18, 2018PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: December 20, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 19, 2018EFILED SUMMONS
Date: July 19, 2018DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: December 20, 2018MOTION TO DISMISS-CONT SEE DOC, FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE OF FILING LEASE AGREEMENT FILED AS EXHIBIT A FILED BY PLTF TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC
Date: January 03, 2019ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK-SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: January 21, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: January 21, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 21, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 21, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 23, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT COUNTER PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: January 31, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: January 31, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL FILED BY DEFT TROY A FORD
Date: February 01, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TROY A FORD
Date: February 04, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: February 19, 2019REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT COUNTER PLTF SKLYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: February 20, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL FILED BY THIRD PARTY DEFT TROY A FORD
Date: February 20, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF COUNTER DEFT TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC
Date: February 20, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL FILED BY THIRD PARTY DEFT TROY A FORD
Date: February 22, 2019NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC
Date: March 06, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF/COUNTER DEFT TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC
Date: April 11, 2019NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT
Date: May 15, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: May 21, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 03, 2019JUDGES WORKSHEET
Date: July 29, 2019NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: August 01, 2019ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR NON JURY TRIAL
Date: August 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 12, 2019CLS: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE FROM COUNTY TO CIRCUIT COURT
Date: September 20, 2019CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE
Date: September 27, 2019CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE
Date: September 30, 2019NOTICE-NOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE-AND MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 21, 2019CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE
Date: October 02, 2019ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE-AND MEDIATION ORDER
Date: November 07, 2019MOTION-STIPULATION SETTING TRIAL TERM
Date: January 22, 2020NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2020ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Date: January 23, 2020MEDIATION REPORT
Date: October 21, 2020NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: February 18, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO WITHDRAW FILED BY PLTF TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC
Date: December 29, 2020WITNESS LIST FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: April 28, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2021MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: May 29, 2020AMENDED WITNESS LIST FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: April 29, 2020NOTICE-NOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: January 13, 2021ORDER FOLLOWING PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2020PRETRIAL COMPLIANCE FILED BY DEFT COUNTER PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: June 18, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: July 20, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: February 10, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AMENDED FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: September 02, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC AND TROY A FORD
Date: March 08, 2021ORDER ON MOTION PLTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT CONT SEE DOC
Date: September 14, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF TROY A FORD FILED BY THIRD PARTY PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: September 23, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF GARY GUSTAFSON FILED BY THIRD PARTY PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NON PARTY GARY GUSTAFSON FILED BY PLTF TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: December 31, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF TREASURE ISLAND CAF LLC
Date: December 31, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC
Date: February 16, 2022ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER
Date: April 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE-NOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFT COUNTER PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF TREASURE ISLAND CAF LLC | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NON PARTY GARY GUSTAFSON FILED BY PLTF TREASURE ISLAND CAFE LLC | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF TROY A FORD FILED BY THIRD PARTY PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF GARY GUSTAFSON FILED BY THIRD PARTY PLTF SKYLARK SCHIPPERS LLC | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION PLTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT CONT SEE DOC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.