Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Joshua Ray Cantrill, Leray Cantrill, filed a(n) case represented by Frank Joseph Currie, Robert John Healy Jr, against Kristopher Scott Ferris, Rachel M Weber, represented by Brandon Robert Scheele, Jeffrey D Peairs, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Joshua Ray Cantrill against defendants Kristopher Scott Ferris and Rachel M. Weber. The complaint states that this is an action for damages exceeding $15,000. On July 20, 2012, Kristopher Scott Ferris operated a motor vehic...
TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT
Date: August 26, 2020TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT
Date: June 08, 2020TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT (2D20-1641)
Date: May 21, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL-RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS
Date: May 20, 2020ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: April 23, 2020DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO JOSHUA RAY CANTRILL'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: April 08, 2020DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO LERAY CANTRILL'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: April 08, 2020MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: May 31, 2019PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: May 30, 2019DEFENDANT KRISTOPHER SCOTT FERRIS'S THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: May 15, 2019PLAINTIFFS THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: May 15, 2019DEFENDANT KRISTOPHER SCOTT FERRIS'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: May 03, 2019DEFENDANT KRISTOPHER SCOTT FERRIS'S SECOND MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: May 03, 2019PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 25, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S SOCIAL MEDIA INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 11, 2019PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 10, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S THIRD UPDATE INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 27, 2019REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: March 27, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S NORTHRUP INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 21, 2019JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 15, 2019REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: February 19, 2019STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 26, 2019TRIAL STIPULATION
Date: July 06, 2018MOTION FOR TRIAL
Date: May 24, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND UPDATED INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 22, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: April 23, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S UPDATED INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 22, 2018OPINION-DISMISSED/OPINION NOW FINAL (WRIT OF CERTIORARI)
Date: April 23, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: February 22, 2018TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: March 23, 2018TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT-
Date: September 27, 2017TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT
Date: October 26, 2017TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT
Date: August 17, 2017TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT
Date: August 08, 2017PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Date: July 31, 2017TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT- THIS CASE SHALL PROCEED IN CERTIORARI
Date: July 28, 2017TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT
Date: June 27, 2017TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT-PROCEED AS A NON-FINAL APPEAL
Date: June 13, 2017REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: December 15, 2016NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: November 16, 2016NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTIES
Date: September 20, 2016NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 03, 2016REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: October 28, 2016STIPULATION FOR TRIAL PERIOD
Date: July 21, 2016REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: May 31, 2016REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: June 08, 2016REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: April 28, 2016NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S UPDATED INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 23, 2016OPINION NOW FINAL-DISMISSED (2D15-2155-PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI)
Date: February 18, 2016NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: February 11, 2016TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: January 29, 2016TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: October 07, 2015TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: September 04, 2015MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY - PLAINTIFF
Date: August 04, 2015TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: August 03, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 23, 2015TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: June 22, 2015TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: June 15, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: June 22, 2015TRUE COPY ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT
Date: June 11, 2015DEFENDANT KRISTOPHER SCOTT FERRIS'S MOTION TO STAY TRIAL PENDING APPEAL
Date: May 29, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: June 03, 2015ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION DENIED
Date: May 06, 2015MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - JOSHUA RAY CANTRILL
Date: May 06, 2015JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 01, 2015MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE - KRISTOPHER SCOTT FERRIS
Date: April 28, 2015MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - JOSHUA RAY CANTRILL
Date: April 28, 2015JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO RACHEL M WEBER ONLY
Date: April 28, 2015NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S BOECHER INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 23, 2015MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( KRISTOPHER SCOTT FERRIS,)
Date: February 25, 2015NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S MORGAN/KATZMAN INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 19, 2015NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S BOECHER INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 11, 2015NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S UPDATED INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 10, 2015NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S MORGAN/KATZMAN INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 10, 2015MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S EXPERTS MICHAEL FOLEY MD AND DAVID DELONGA MD PHD
Date: January 29, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: January 28, 2015NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 22, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 05, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS IMPEACHMENT INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 11, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 11, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 11, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS TRIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 11, 2014REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: November 19, 2014OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMITT TO EXAMINATION
Date: November 19, 2014REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: November 07, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 05, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING TRIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 05, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 05, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 05, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING IMPEACHMENT INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 05, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 28, 2014REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: July 10, 2014REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 24, 2014STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 16, 2014MOTION FOR TRIAL
Date: June 05, 2014STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 12, 2014REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: March 28, 2014REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 17, 2014NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: December 11, 2013REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: October 23, 2013NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 10, 2013REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: October 04, 2013REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: October 02, 2013REQUEST FOR COPIES VIA EMAIL
Date: September 23, 2013ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- DEFENDANT, KRISTOPHER SCOTT FERRIS
Date: September 05, 2013ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - RACHEL M. WEBER
Date: August 27, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2013NOTICE OF APPEAL OF NON-FINAL ORDERS -RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS
Date: June 08, 2017DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE TRIAL
Date: January 25, 2017MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENSE WITNESS DAVID DELONGA
Date: January 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT - THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED BECAUSE OF THE APPELLANTS FAILURE TO SATISFY THIS COURTS MAY 21, 2020, FEE ORDER RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT - THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED BECAUSE OF THE APPELLANT'S FAILURE TO SATISFY THIS COURTS MAY 21, 2020, FEE ORDER | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS APPELLATE COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DEEANN J. MCLEMORE, ESQUIRE AND CHARLES W. HALL, ESQUIRE | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT-FILING FEE (2D20-1641) | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | TRUE COPY ORDER FROM THE DISTRICT COURT (2D20-1641) | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT-APPEAL NO. 2D20-1641 | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT-APPEAL NO. 2D20-1634 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.