Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Dream Lands Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Hoover, Myles Alexander, against All Persons Unknown, Defreytas, Edwin P, Defreytas, Elna M, Hogan, Edward R, Hogan, Rose E, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with ESTRADA, PETER FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeESTRADA, PETER FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed in the Circuit Court of the Tenth Judicial Circuit in Highlands County, Florida. The plaintiff, Florida Dream Lands, LLC, is suing multiple defendants, including Edward R. Hogan, Rose E. Hogan, Edwin P. Defreytas, Elna M. Def...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 09, 2023COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ELNA DEFREYTAS)
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION (FORWARDED ELECTRONICALLY TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 12/15/23
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (EDWARD HOGAN)
Date: November 13, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (EDWIN DEFREYTAS)
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (ROSE HOGAN)
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (ELNA DEFREYTAS)
Date: November 13, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION - DEFAULT DATE: 12/15/2023) - HARD COPY
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ROSE HOGAN)
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (EDWARD HOGAN)
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (EDWIN DEFREYTAS)
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (EDWARD; ROSE; DEFREYTASP; ELNA; ALL PERSONS UNK)
Date: December 20, 2023MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT (COUNT I)
Date: December 20, 2023MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT (COUNT II)
Date: December 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (EDWARD; ROSE; DEFREYTASP; ELNA; ALL PERSONS UNK) | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT (COUNT I) | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT (COUNT II) | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION - DEFAULT DATE: 12/15/2023) - HARD COPY | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION (FORWARDED ELECTRONICALLY TO NEWS SUN BY CKW) DEFAULT DATE: 12/15/23 | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $419.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ELNA DEFREYTAS) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 271974 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.