Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
First Federal Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Church, Kelley Louise, against Chambers, Christopher, Dashawn Williams, Andrea, Lindsay, Yvette M, Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries De, Unknown Tenant 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKOBERLEIN JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: January 13, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: January 13, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 13, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE
Date: January 13, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 01/20/2022
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (RECORDED)
Date: January 13, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: January 13, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NON-SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: January 24, 2022THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: January 13, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE - YVETTE LINDSAY
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - SERVED ON YVETTE LINDSAY ON 01/21/2022 AT 10:30AM
Date: April 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - NONSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ON 01/21/2022
Date: April 07, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE - CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS
Date: January 13, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE - ANDREA WILLIAMS
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - NONSERVED ANDREA WILLIAMS ON 02/20/2022
Date: April 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ON 01/21/2022
Date: April 07, 2022DIRECTIONS TO CLERK
Date: April 18, 2022ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE NON-SERVED CHRISTOPHER CHAMBERS ON 02/19/2022
Date: April 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY TO DETERMINE MILITARY STATUS
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE FOR ANDREA DASHAWN WILLIAMS
Date: April 15, 2022NOTICE OF FILING - PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: April 19, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: April 26, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTERING DEFAULT
Date: June 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICES PURSUANT TO SECTION 49.12, FS
Date: April 18, 2022ORDER TO SERVED DEFENDANT'S
Date: April 20, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: September 12, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: June 13, 2022NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING - 11/17/22 AT 9AM
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: November 16, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING - 11/17/22 AT 1:30PM
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 6/14/23
Date: May 15, 2023GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION(S) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 19, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: December 07, 2022AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: December 02, 2022GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION(S) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERECE
Date: August 09, 2023CLERK'S NOTICE OF SALE
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: January 23, 2023GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION(S) - CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE - 11/8/23
Date: November 13, 2023RETURNED MAIL - UNKNOWN HEIRS, ETC
Date: January 26, 2023RETURNED MAIL - A. WILLIAMS
Date: April 11, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT - AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: May 02, 2023ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 29, 2023AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 11, 2024ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 04-22-2024 @ 3:00 pm
Date: February 27, 2024NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: February 02, 2024ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 23, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 04-22-2024 @ 3:00 pm | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT on 2/21/2024 1100 AM Judge FRED KOBERLEIN JR results CONTINUED on 2/26/2024 | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 4/22/2024 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge FRED KOBERLEIN JR presiding. | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT on 1/10/2024 0130 PM Judge SAMUEL PERRONE results RESCHEDULED on 12/29/2023 | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 2/21/2024 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge FRED KOBERLEIN JR presiding. | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT on 11/8/2023 0130 PM Judge SAMUEL PERRONE results HELD on 11/20/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.