Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Career Financial Corp., filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Macia, Alberto Antonio, against Labelle Land Partnership, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 07, 2022COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: April 07, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 07, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)- 20043 BUTTERMERE COURT, ESTERO, FL 33928
Date: April 09, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)-14769 OSPREY POINT DRIVE, FORT MYERS, FL 33908
Date: April 09, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (WAITING ON RECEORDING)
Date: April 08, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)-10970 S CLEVELAND AVENUE #303 FT. MYERS, FL
Date: April 09, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (FORWARD TO BE RECORDED)
Date: April 11, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) PROFIT SHARING TRUST
Date: April 19, 2022RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: April 11, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:LABELLE LAND PARTNERSHIP
Date: July 07, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) 20816 SUGARLOAF LANE, BOCA RATON, FL 33428
Date: April 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE-DAVID B KAGAN 20816 SUGARLOAF LANE
Date: April 27, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION- TO BE ISSUED- LABELLE LAND PARTNERSHIP
Date: May 27, 2022SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: May 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION/COMPLIANCE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: May 31, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE- SENT THU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: August 08, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION- LAKE OKEECHOBEE NEWS
Date: June 23, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST: LABELLE LAND PARTNER
Date: July 06, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE- FORWARD TO (RECORDING)
Date: August 05, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: August 10, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE- BOOK # 385; PAGE # 1011
Date: August 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE- BOOK # 385; PAGE # 1011 | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE- SENT THU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | RCVD FILE BACK FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE- FORWARD TO (RECORDING) | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:LABELLE LAND PARTNERSHIP | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:LABELLE LAND PARTNERSHIP, DAVID KAGAN, PROFIT SHARING | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER- FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.