Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Draper, Jerilyn Sue, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case against Feld, Jeffrey D, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Jerilyn Sue Draper against Jeffrey D. Feld in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Collier County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $15,000. The jurisdiction and venue are ap...
Motion to Strike -
Date:Notice of Conflict
Date:Notice of Unavailability
Date:Answer by Jeffrey D Feld
Date:Complaint, Amended
Date:Standing Order - Circuit
Date:Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Draper, Jerilyn Sue (Plaintiff)
Date: August 09, 2018Exhibits
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Appearance by Cornell, Jr G Ware for Jeffrey D Feld
Date: June 28, 2018Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Count Two Replevin Of The Amended Complaint
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Default Entered to Jeffrey D Feld
Date: June 28, 2018Release Of Lien
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: June 27, 2018Motion to Strike -
Date: June 25, 2018Motion for Rehearing/Reconsideration -
Date: June 25, 2018Request for Copies
Date: June 20, 2018Summary Judgment on Feld, Jeffrey D Recorded 2018-06-20 Instrument# 5573990
Date: June 19, 2018Order for Summary Judgment
Date: June 19, 2018Cover Letter
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Conflict
Date: June 15, 2018Notice of Default Entered to Jeffrey D Feld
Date: June 15, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 15, 2018Notice of Hearing - Amended for Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: May 24, 2018Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 24, 2018Correspondence to Judge, from Defendant
Date: May 18, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment - by Draper, Jerilyn Sue
Date: May 10, 2018Affidavit of Jerilyn Draper
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Service of Offer/Proposal of Settlement
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Hearing for Motion For Final Default Judgment @ 10:00
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Default Entered to Jeffrey D Feld
Date: April 09, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint by Jeffrey D Feld
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 30, 2018Motion for Final Default Judgment -
Date: March 28, 2018Affidavit of Jerilyn Draper
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 28, 2018Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment -
Date: March 28, 2018Default entered by court on Jeffrey D Feld
Date: March 15, 2018Cover Letter
Date: March 15, 2018Motion for Court's Default on Feld, Jeffrey D
Date: March 12, 2018Answer by Jeffrey D Feld
Date: February 27, 2018Return of Service of Summons on Feld, Jeffrey D, served 02/07/2018
Date: February 08, 2018Complaint, Amended
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 31, 2018Paid $410.00 on receipt 899846, Fully Paid
Date: December 20, 2017Standing Order - Circuit
Date: December 19, 2017Summons issued
Date: December 19, 2017Cover Letter
Date: August 09, 2018Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Stipulation
Date: August 01, 2018Complaint
Date: December 19, 2017Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Draper, Jerilyn Sue (Plaintiff) | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Stipulation | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance by Cornell, Jr G Ware for Jeffrey D Feld | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Entered to Jeffrey D Feld | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Release Of Lien | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Cancelled Hearing on 6/28/2018 3:00:00 PM due to |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.