Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Stabrylla, Stephanie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Diplacido, Frank P, Mcmahan, Ashley Danise, against Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois, Whitkopf, Elizabeth, represented by Johnson Esquire, Laura W, Lemongello, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS/INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 24, 2023CERTIFICATE - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - STEPHANIE STABRYLLA - NOV 16, 2023 @ 9:00 A.M.
Date: July 28, 2023DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON- PARTY
Date: January 11, 2024RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 01, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - STEPHANIE STABRYLLA - NOVEMBER 16, 2023 @ 9:00 A.M.
Date: August 02, 2023SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 17, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 07, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 12, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: May 12, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - ELIZABETH WHITKOPF - SERVED - 07/26/2023
Date: July 26, 2023PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2023034480
Date: July 11, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 01, 2023DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 04, 2023DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES)
Date: July 24, 2023DEFENDANT;S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 16, 2024REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 12, 2023SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED ELIZABETH WHITKOPF
Date: March 17, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 07, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 24, 2023INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Date: May 12, 2023DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR MEDICAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 03/22/2024 @ 09:30 AM
Date: March 14, 2024STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT
Date: March 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - ELIZABETH WHITKOPF - SERVED - 05/22/2023
Date: May 24, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ELIZABETH WHITKOPF
Date: July 10, 2023INTERROGATORIES AND NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 12, 2023DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 24, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 29, 2023PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ELIZABETH WHITKOPF
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 15, 2024COURT MINUTES
Date: March 22, 2024NOTICE OF DEFENDANT, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS' ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE OF NON BINDING ARBITRATION
Date: September 26, 2023DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 04, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 03/22/2024 @ 09:30 AM
Date: March 05, 2024ATTORNEY CERTIFICATE
Date: November 22, 2023PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONSTO DEFENDANT,ELIZABETH WHITKOPF
Date: July 10, 2023DEFENDANT;S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 20, 2024ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL / NON - JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: November 03, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 17, 2023DEFENDANT, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANT OF ILLINOIS' EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 03, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Date: July 10, 2023MOTION - SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 20, 2024PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023018545
Date: March 20, 2023WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS' WITNESS LIST
Date: October 31, 2023DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 24, 2023DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST
Date: March 20, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: July 10, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS/INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 01, 2023STIPULATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: November 08, 2023PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCE
Date: July 03, 2023ORDER REFERRING CASE TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION
Date: September 08, 2023DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY
Date: September 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: January 26, 2024CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES)
Date: September 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: December 06, 2023DEFENDNAT, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS' SUPPLEMENTAL WITNES LIST
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 01, 2023PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST TO PRODUCETO DEFENDANT,ELIZABETH WHITKOPF
Date: July 10, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS
Date: March 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER SETTING JURY / NON- JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFRENCE
Date: March 22, 2024DEFENDANT, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: July 25, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 04, 2023MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 12, 2023DEFENDNAT'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: March 20, 2024DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: September 24, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 18, 20239/27/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/26/2023
Date: April 01, 20249/24/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/26/2023
Date: April 26, 20359/21/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/8/2023
Date: April 04, 20249/7/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/13/2023
Date: April 01, 20249/13/2023
Date: April 03, 20249/1/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/1/2023
Date: April 03, 20249/13/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/7/2023
Date: April 03, 20249/1/2023
Date: April 05, 20249/1/2023
Date: April 04, 20249/1/2023
Date: April 01, 20248/29/2023
Date: April 04, 20248/4/2023
Date: April 01, 20248/24/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/25/2023
Date: April 03, 20248/4/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/25/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/26/2023
Date: April 03, 20247/28/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/24/2023
Date: April 09, 20248/2/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/24/2023
Date: April 03, 20247/24/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/24/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/10/2023
Date: April 05, 20247/11/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/10/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/10/2023
Date: April 09, 20247/10/2023
Date: April 07, 20246/12/2023
Date: April 12, 20246/12/2023
Date: April 04, 20246/12/2023
Date: April 06, 20247/3/2023
Date: April 05, 20246/12/2023
Date: April 02, 20245/12/2023
Date: April 08, 20246/19/2023
Date: April 02, 20245/12/2023
Date: April 11, 20245/12/2023
Date: April 02, 20245/24/2023
Date: April 04, 20245/25/2023
Date: April 03, 20245/12/2023
Date: April 03, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/17/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/17/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/17/2023
Date: April 03, 20243/17/2023
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2035 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.