Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Palmer, Ashley L, against Sheridan, Erik J, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryMatters Involving Claims 2,501 - 8,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
COURT MINUTES
Date: March 31, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ERIK J SHERIDAN - 1/11/2021 @ 9:15PM
Date: January 13, 2021STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ERIK J SHERIDAN - ZOOM SHEET IS ATTACHED
Date: December 31, 2020PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021009195
Date: December 31, 2020SUMMONS REQUEST
Date: December 31, 2020MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: November 13, 2022PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2023004070
Date: November 14, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER STIPULATED AGREEMENT
Date: January 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - ERIK J SHERIDAN
Date: February 14, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER STIPULATED AGREEMENT - RECORDED (O.4915.1435. / 3050222)
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATION
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - ERIK J SHERIDAN
Date: April 21, 2021NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2022RECORD OF AGREEMENT
Date: March 31, 20214/21/2023
Date: April 04, 20242/23/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/24/2023
Date: April 02, 20242/13/2023
Date: April 01, 202411/13/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/11/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/26/2023
Date: April 08, 20242/14/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/27/2023
Date: April 03, 20241/6/2023
Date: April 02, 202411/14/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/18/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/18/2022
Date: April 03, 20241/25/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/21/2021
Date: April 02, 20242/14/2022
Date: April 04, 20243/31/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/13/2021
Date: April 04, 202412/31/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/31/2020
Date: April 02, 202412/31/2020
Date: April 03, 202412/31/2020
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.