Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Brittney Alexandra filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Keller, Edgar Junior Jr, represented by Davis, Brittney Alexandra, Harris, Robert P, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: January 07, 2021MOTION/REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: January 15, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: January 15, 2021PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 8/25 @ 1:30PM
Date: July 21, 2020SURETY BOND AS30K-146248 POSTED $20,000.00
Date: September 30, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: July 22, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: October 15, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: October 08, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 18, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - STATUS HR 01/20 @ 2PM - JURY TRIAL 02/08/2021 @ 9AM - SPECIAL SET
Date: December 16, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: October 06, 2020MOTION/REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: October 06, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CC 12/16 @ 9AM
Date: October 07, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: October 07, 2020BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: September 30, 2020SURETY BOND AS30K141971 POSTED $20,000.00
Date: July 01, 2020STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM
Date: July 24, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: October 01, 2020PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - CC 10/7 @ 9AM
Date: August 25, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: September 30, 2020OFF BOND
Date: July 24, 2020BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: July 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 25, 2020MOTION TO SET BOND
Date: June 24, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE M/GRANTED SET BOND
Date: June 30, 2020LETTER FROM DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY AND CHECK
Date: June 24, 2020MOTION/STIPULATION TO DISCHARGE SURETY FROM BOND
Date: June 12, 2020STIPULATION TO DISCHARGE SURETY FROM BOND
Date: June 17, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 02, 2020PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER PTC 7/21 1:30 WST
Date: June 01, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: June 22, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 22, 2020REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Date: April 06, 2020MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPTS
Date: April 22, 2020ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPTS
Date: April 29, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK HABITUAL FELONY OFFENDER STATUS
Date: May 29, 2020PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: July 02, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: July 10, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: May 04, 2020RESPONSE
Date: January 30, 2020CITATION (TICKET)
Date: September 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 27, 2018ORDER APPOINTING EXPERTS TRANSCRIPTS AND PI
Date: February 05, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: October 17, 2019NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: January 30, 2020MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, OR EXPENSES
Date: January 28, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 26, 2020ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISCHARGE SURETY FROM BOND
Date: June 19, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 18, 2019PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER PTC 3/3 1:30
Date: January 28, 2020SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION SERVED
Date: October 18, 2019PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 12/17 1:30
Date: October 15, 2019RESPONSE FROM JAC
Date: September 24, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 20, 2019NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 05, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 20, 2019PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER PTC 4/7 @ 1:30PM
Date: March 03, 2020MOTION FOR DEPOSITION FEE FOR EXPERT WITNESS FOR IDIGENT DEF
Date: September 25, 2019ORDER FOR DEPOSITION FEES FOR EXPERT WITNESS FOR INDIGENT DEF
Date: September 25, 2019SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION SERVED
Date: December 02, 2019PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 1/28 1:30
Date: December 17, 2019RESPONSE FROM JAC
Date: July 30, 2019PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER PTC 10/15 @ 1:30
Date: July 30, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 11, 2019NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 29, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED - GOWIN
Date: April 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE
Date: July 30, 2019MOTION FOR DEPOSITION FEES FOR EXPERT WITNESS FOR INDIGENT DEFENDANT
Date: September 20, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 27, 2019SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION - SERVED- WENZ
Date: August 26, 2019SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION- SERVED - ELIASSEN
Date: August 26, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED - DA VOULT
Date: April 02, 2019SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL SERVED OFFICER JOSEPH TRUFAN
Date: April 02, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 27, 2019MOTION TO DECLARE DEFENDANT INDIGENT FOR COSTS AND DEPOSITIONS
Date: July 30, 2019DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: May 28, 2019MOTION TO DECLARE DEFENDANT INDIGENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: September 13, 2019SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION SERVED BROOKS
Date: September 03, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: September 19, 2019NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: July 31, 2019NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 07, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED - IRVING
Date: April 02, 2019MOTION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: June 05, 2019SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL SERVED LINET KAMANDULIS
Date: April 05, 2019SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL SERVED - FRANCESCA M SWARTZ
Date: April 10, 2019COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - CC 6/5 @ 9
Date: May 01, 2019STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 05, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED - CHODAKOWSKY
Date: April 02, 2019COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE PTC 7/30 9AM - REDESIGNATE AS COMPLEX
Date: June 05, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED - ELIASSEN
Date: March 29, 2019NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: May 03, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD JURY TRL
Date: May 28, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED - CONF WITNESS
Date: April 01, 2019WARRANT OTSC/ORDER REVOKING SPVSD RELEASE SERVED
Date: January 30, 2019BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: January 30, 2019RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: January 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: January 30, 2019RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING - LEE CO.
Date: January 28, 2019BOOKING REPORT FILED - LEE COUNTY
Date: January 30, 2019BOOKING REPORT FILED - LEE CO.
Date: January 28, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED - BURGA
Date: April 02, 2019ORDER TO TRANSPORT
Date: January 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE - LEE CO.
Date: January 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: December 09, 2018BENCH WARRANT SERVED
Date: January 30, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: December 12, 2018SURETY BOND SS3017806 POSTED $20,000.00
Date: December 10, 2018NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 11, 2018BENCH WARRANT ISSUED
Date: January 16, 2019INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - COMPLEX
Date: December 21, 2018NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: March 08, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: February 07, 2019PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - TRIAL CALL 5/1 @ 9
Date: March 19, 2019DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES
Date: December 08, 2018ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: January 08, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: February 27, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 3/19 @ 9
Date: February 13, 2019ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE ISSUED
Date: December 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE
Date: December 19, 2018RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: December 09, 2018ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (AMENDED)
Date: January 24, 2019BOOKING REPORT FILED-LEE CO.
Date: December 08, 2018ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: December 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: December 08, 2018BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: December 08, 2018BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: December 10, 2018RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: December 08, 2018ORDER GRANTING SUPERVISED RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE
Date: December 10, 2018ARREST WARRANT SERVED
Date: December 08, 2018BOOKING REPORT FILED - LEE COUNTY
Date: December 07, 2018ORDER GRANTING SUPERVISED RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE - LEE COUNTY
Date: December 07, 2018RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING - LEE COUNTY ON 12/2/18
Date: December 07, 2018RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING - LEE COUNTY ON 12/4/18
Date: December 07, 2018PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: January 25, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - JURY TRIAL 04/05 @ 9 AM
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: January 22, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE STATUS HR 01/28 @ 1PM (CANCEL 2/8 AND 2/4)
Date: January 20, 2021SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL
Date: February 02, 2021PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 01, 2021STATE'S MOTION TO PERMIT LIVE VIDEO TESTIMONY
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 01, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: January 29, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: February 12, 2021DEFENDANT'S RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY
Date: March 30, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - M/PERMIT LIVE VIDEO TESTIMONY - DENIED - STATUS 5/5 2:00
Date: March 31, 2021RESPONSE -DEFENDANTS TO MOTION TO PERMIT LIVE TESTIMONY
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: April 02, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: April 07, 2021ORDER FILED ON STATE'S MOTION TO PERMIT LIVE VIDEO TESTIMONY
Date: April 01, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: April 13, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - TRIAL CALL 7/20/21 @ 9:00 - LEAVE STATUS ON 5/5
Date: April 08, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE STATUS 7/14 2PM
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: May 06, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE M/ GRANTED TO ALLOW VIDEO TESTIMONY
Date: July 14, 2021MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: July 01, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: July 02, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) - MOTION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY - 7/14 @ 11AM
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD
Date: June 11, 2021PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 02, 2021STATE'S MOTION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY
Date: May 27, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - MOTION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY GRANTED
Date: June 14, 2021PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: May 07, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED UNEXECUTED
Date: May 11, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: May 26, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: July 15, 2021PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: July 15, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: July 15, 2021LIST OF EXHIBITS
Date: July 14, 2021MEMORANDUM REQUESTING CITATION
Date: August 28, 2018LETTER TO DEFENDANT' S ATTORNEY
Date: June 24, 2020ARREST WARRANT REVIEW CHECKLIST
Date: January 16, 2019BOND DISCHARGE SLIP
Date: July 24, 2020BOND DISCHARGE SLIP
Date: June 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL ORDER | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE M/ GRANTED TO ALLOW VIDEO TESTIMONY | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) - MOTION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY - 7/14 @ 11AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.