Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beaugrand, Iris, filed a(n) Other - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories case against O'Toole, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 101 |
CategoryOther - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
COURT MINUTES
Date: December 16, 2019MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF IRIS BEAUGRAND
Date: December 09, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING - 12/16/19 @ 1:30PM
Date: December 09, 2019ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION
Date: February 13, 2020PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2019ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL/NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: December 03, 2019RE- NOTICE OF HEARING ON BOB O'TOOLE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT 12/16/19 @ 1:30 PM
Date: November 19, 2019ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Recorded (O.4518.1000 / 2770513)
Date: December 18, 2019BOB O'TOOLE'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2019NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE REFERRAL
Date: November 19, 2019PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES AND AGREED PROPOSED ORDER
Date: February 10, 2020ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - Recorded (O.4539.985 / 2786307)
Date: February 13, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING - 1/30/2020 @ 1:30PM
Date: January 09, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 02, 2019MOTION FOR PARTIAL OR FULL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 24, 2019ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING
Date: December 06, 2019NOTICE FOR TRIAL
Date: November 19, 2019PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 12, 2019PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 10 THROUGH 13
Date: July 24, 2019PLAINTIFF'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT
Date: July 24, 2019RESPONSE BY BOB O'TOOLE TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 23, 2019NOTICE THAT BOB O'TOOLE HAS ANSWERED INTERROGATORIES #10-13
Date: August 23, 2019BOB O'TOOLE'S NOTICE OF FILING SARASOTA RECORD [RELEVANT EXCERPTS]
Date: June 19, 2019COURT MINUTES
Date: June 25, 2019ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2019RESPONSE TO BOB O'TOOLE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 02, 2019BOB O'TOOLE'S NOTICE OF FILING APPELLATE BRIEFS
Date: June 19, 2019BOB O'TOOLE'S NOTICE OF FILING HEARING TRANSCRIPT [SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION]
Date: June 19, 2019TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS 90126777 101 PAGES
Date: May 28, 2019EXHIBIT - MAY 2, 2018 TRANSCRIPT OF SARASOTA PROCEEDING
Date: May 28, 2019TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: June 13, 2019BOB O'TOOLE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 05, 2019PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING APPELLATE PLEADINGS
Date: June 13, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING - 6/25/19 - 1:30PM
Date: June 01, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING - 6/25/19 @ 1:30PM
Date: June 05, 2019REPLY OF BOB O'TOOLE TO ANSWER FILED BY BEAUGRAND
Date: June 03, 2019EXHIBIT - VOLUME I AND II OF TRANSCRIPT OF SARASOTA PROCEEDING
Date: May 28, 2019PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM
Date: May 10, 2019PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 13, 2019PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 10, 2019EXHIBIT - VOLUME III OF TRANSCRIPT OF SARASOTA PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 28, 2019EXHIBIT - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDING EVIDENCE EXHIBITS PLAINTIFF 1 THROUGH 4
Date: May 25, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 18, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC)
Date: September 26, 2018ORDER FOR STAY PENDENTE LITE
Date: September 26, 2018ROBERT O'TOOLE'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO IRIS BEAUGRAND
Date: August 10, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: July 20, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 16, 2018NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: July 18, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1 THROUGH 9
Date: May 13, 2019AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: May 23, 2018REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC)
Date: May 07, 2019NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFLICT
Date: April 03, 2019ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC)
Date: May 06, 2019PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: May 03, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Date: May 03, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 21, 2018PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2018036143
Date: June 21, 2018AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSTION DUCES TECUM
Date: July 03, 2018BOB O'TOOLE'S NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 21, 2018VERIFIED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE: ANSWER OF O'TOOLE TO AN INTERROGATORY
Date: August 10, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: June 25, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 6/4/18 @ 10:30 AM
Date: May 01, 2018AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 28, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE
Date: April 28, 2017JOINT MOTION AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: April 16, 2018NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 09, 2018NOTICE CANCELLING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING - 6/4/18 @ 10:30 AM
Date: May 23, 2018ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - COUNTER
Date: June 21, 2018STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: February 27, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2017ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY - GRANTED
Date: February 21, 2018REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE
Date: August 22, 2017AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 30, 2018ORDER APPROVING GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS
Date: September 18, 2017COURT MINUTES
Date: August 16, 2017JOINT STIPULATION
Date: August 16, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - 2/28/17 - ROBERT O'TOOLE
Date: February 27, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 27, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY BRET CLARK, ESQ
Date: March 20, 2017PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017019544
Date: February 28, 2017BOB O'TOOLE'S NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL TRANSCRIPT
Date: June 19, 2019COURT MINUTES - CMC
Date: February 21, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: September 24, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: June 04, 2018COURT MINUTES- INITIAL PTC
Date: May 06, 201912/6/2019
Date: April 01, 20242/13/2020
Date: April 01, 20242/10/2020
Date: April 04, 202412/24/2019
Date: April 06, 202412/24/2019
Date: April 04, 202412/18/2019
Date: April 01, 20241/9/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/12/2019
Date: April 03, 202412/11/2019
Date: April 28, 202412/9/2019
Date: April 23, 202412/16/2019
Date: April 01, 202412/9/2019
Date: April 01, 20246/25/2019
Date: April 02, 20247/2/2019
Date: April 01, 20246/19/2019
Date: April 22, 20246/19/2019
Date: April 27, 1546/19/2019
Date: April 27, 19936/13/2019
Date: April 27, 20426/14/2019
Date: April 03, 20246/13/2019
Date: April 29, 20246/19/2019
Date: April 10, 20246/13/2019
Date: April 01, 20246/5/2019
Date: April 01, 20246/13/2019
Date: April 27, 20536/5/2019
Date: April 15, 20245/28/2019
Date: April 27, 20705/28/2019
Date: April 27, 1016/1/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/28/2019
Date: April 27, 19766/3/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/28/2019
Date: April 06, 20245/25/2019
Date: April 27, 1365/25/2019
Date: April 27, 19865/25/2019
Date: April 27, 1505/28/2019
Date: April 27, 20435/25/2019
Date: April 27, 1525/23/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/25/2019
Date: April 26, 20245/25/2019
Date: April 19, 20245/13/2019
Date: April 03, 20245/14/2019
Date: April 27, 20245/13/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/10/2019
Date: April 27, 20325/7/2019
Date: April 02, 20245/6/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/6/2019
Date: April 02, 20245/10/2019
Date: April 25, 20245/3/2019
Date: April 02, 20244/3/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/3/2019
Date: April 01, 20244/5/2019
Date: April 01, 20243/4/2019
Date: April 01, 20249/26/2018
Date: April 02, 20249/26/2018
Date: April 01, 20249/24/2018
Date: April 02, 20248/16/2018
Date: April 02, 20248/10/2018
Date: April 01, 20249/21/2018
Date: April 01, 20249/18/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/3/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/25/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/21/2018
Date: April 25, 20247/20/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/18/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/21/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/4/2018
Date: April 01, 20245/23/2018
Date: April 04, 20246/12/2018
Date: April 01, 20245/23/2018
Date: April 01, 20244/16/2018
Date: April 02, 20245/18/2018
Date:5/15/2018
Date: April 03, 20245/1/2018
Date: April 02, 20242/28/2018
Date: April 02, 20243/28/2018
Date: April 01, 20243/9/2018
Date: April 01, 20243/1/2018
Date: April 01, 20241/30/2018
Date: April 02, 20242/21/2018
Date: April 01, 20248/22/2017
Date: April 02, 20242/13/2018
Date: April 01, 20249/18/2017
Date: April 01, 20248/16/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/28/2017
Date: April 03, 20246/20/2017
Date: April 03, 20248/16/2017
Date: April 02, 20243/20/2017
Date: April 01, 20242/28/2017
Date: April 01, 20242/27/2017
Date: April 04, 20242/27/2017
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2070 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2053 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2043 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2042 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2032 | Docket Event | ||
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.