Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chicago Tilte Ins Co, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Brodsky, Tamarah E, against Reid, Beverley Ann Marie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Feld, Ellen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFeld, Ellen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Notice of Filing
Date: May 22, 2019Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment
Date: June 26, 2019Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: June 26, 2019Answer of Garnishee
Date: August 16, 2019Answer of Garnishee
Date: July 03, 2019Final Judgment in Garnishment
Date: October 01, 2019Objection to Claim of Exemption
Date: September 11, 2019Motion for Judgment in Garnishment
Date: September 25, 2019Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment
Date: October 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION -Garnishee |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment in Garnishment -as to Garnishee Bank of America Nat Assn |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment in Garnishment BANK OF AMERICA NA. |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing By Judge | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Objection to Claim of Exemption | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee RELIACARE INC |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing Party: Defendant Reid, Beverley Ann Marie |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Served Bank of America, National Association.// Served: 06/28/2019Party: Defendant Reid, Beverley Ann Marie |
|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
CC/TC of Continuing Garnishment W/Req Forms Issd TO ATTY/MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.