Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gonzalez, Ramon, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Englander, Gary Brian, against The Set Enterprises, Inc., represented by Emery, Antwon M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 25, 2022Notice of Interrogatories
Date: September 13, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 05, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: September 13, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: August 18, 2022Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 06, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 26, 2022Request for Production
Date: September 13, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: October 05, 2022Case Management Order
Date: October 21, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: January 24, 2023Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 05, 2022Notice for/of Trial
Date: November 10, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 08, 2022Request for Production
Date: July 08, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: July 08, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 08, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: July 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice for/of Trial | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Interrogatories | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Ramon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.