Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beaches Open Mri Of Tamarac Llc, Presgar Imaging Of Cmi North Lc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Wenzel, Thomas J, against Lm General Insurance Company, represented by Guzzi, Gary, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBowman, John B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Hearing
Date: February 03, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: October 04, 2022Motion to Enforce
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 17, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 09, 2022Joint Motion
Date: February 28, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: February 28, 2023Order
Date: March 07, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: March 07, 2023Request to Produce
Date: March 13, 2023Joint Motion
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 13, 2023Request for Production
Date: March 24, 2023Response to Request for Production
Date: April 12, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: June 07, 2023Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 12, 2023Stipulation
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 28, 2023Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 03, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 13, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 24, 2023Joint Motion
Date: June 08, 2023Order Amending
Date: June 14, 2023Request
Date: July 06, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 12, 2023Notice
Date: June 30, 2023Request
Date: July 13, 2023Notice
Date: July 13, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 14, 2023Amended
Date: July 17, 2023Motion for Approval
Date: August 31, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: September 16, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: September 14, 2023Motion for Approval
Date: August 31, 2023Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 19, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 19, 2020eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: July 08, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: October 20, 2020Acceptance of Service
Date: September 10, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 29, 2020Motion to Consolidate
Date: November 09, 2020Motion Requesting Transfer of Bus -Tort Case to Complex Div
Date: November 16, 2020Order to Consolidate (Copy)
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: November 25, 2020Response
Date: December 28, 2020Order Denying
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 11, 2021Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 14, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 24, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 28, 2021Order Denying Motion
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 20, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 06, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 23, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 31, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 07, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 02, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 19, 2021Order On Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Approval PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ENTRY OF FINL JUDGMENT |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Approval PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS COUNSEL'S ATTORNEYS' FEES, TAXABLE COSTS, AND INCENTIVE AWADS TO PLAINTIFFS |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended NOTICE OF FILING OPT- OUT EXCLUSION REQUESTSParty: Plaintiff Presgar Imaging Of CMI North LC Plaintiff Beaches Open MRI of Tamarac LLC |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Request | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Request to be excluded from the Class Action Settlement |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.