Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zingaro, Karla, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Rosen, Eric Scott, against American Tobacco Co, Liggett Group Llc, Lorillard Inc, Lorillard Tobacco Co, Philip Morris Usa Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Hohnbaum, Cory, Sherouse, Thomas Mcdougal, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryProducts Liability/Tobacco Litigation |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Agreed Order
Date: February 21, 2017Motion
Date: June 10, 2016Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: January 30, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: January 11, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: January 24, 2017Response to Motion
Date: January 30, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 07, 2017Order
Date: January 31, 2017Notice
Date: March 16, 2016Notice of Interrogatories
Date: August 03, 2016Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: January 17, 2017Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 14, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: January 07, 2014Request for Production of Documents
Date: August 03, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: September 14, 2016Motion
Date: July 03, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: October 07, 2014Order Granting
Date: July 19, 2016Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 19, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: September 05, 2018Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: February 15, 2017Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 04, 2017Agreed Order
Date: April 18, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 07, 2017Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 07, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: September 19, 2018Motion
Date: February 26, 2019Memorandum in Support
Date: January 26, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: May 17, 2018Opposition
Date: April 18, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: February 19, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 13, 2017Motion for Leave to File
Date: January 26, 2018Agreed Order
Date: August 28, 2017Order
Date: March 06, 2018Objection
Date: March 05, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 24, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: October 11, 2018Amended
Date: November 26, 2018Motion
Date: September 19, 2018Motion
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 22, 2017Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: November 07, 2018Opposition
Date: June 15, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: October 19, 2018Agreed Order
Date: July 30, 2018Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witness List
Date: October 16, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 31, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: September 12, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: December 03, 2018Motion
Date: November 08, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: June 18, 2018Motion
Date: September 19, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: October 12, 2018Motion
Date: September 19, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 07, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 07, 2017Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 15, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: September 20, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: March 06, 2017Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: May 07, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 17, 2018Agreed Order
Date: December 06, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: August 09, 2017Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 14, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 18, 2019Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: August 29, 2018Notice
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Notice
Date: March 07, 2019Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witness List
Date: August 31, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: September 20, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion
Date: March 11, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Notice
Date: March 07, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: October 01, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: June 18, 2018Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: August 10, 2018Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 08, 2019Notice
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Notice
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: September 21, 2018Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion
Date: March 11, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 19, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion
Date: March 07, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: October 19, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: November 07, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: February 08, 2019Agreed Order
Date: February 20, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: September 24, 2018Motion
Date: March 07, 2019Motion
Date: March 11, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Notice
Date: March 07, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion
Date: September 19, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Agreed Order
Date: October 12, 2018Response
Date: March 18, 2019Motion
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion
Date: May 17, 2019Motion
Date: April 24, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion
Date: April 05, 2019Order
Date: April 05, 2019Motion
Date: March 25, 2019Brief
Date: April 10, 2019Brief
Date: April 12, 2019Order
Date: April 03, 2019Memo
Date: April 03, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: May 17, 2019Opposition
Date: August 01, 2019Opposition
Date: April 15, 2019Opposition
Date: March 26, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 25, 2019Memo
Date: April 29, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 23, 2019Agreed Order
Date: March 22, 2019Motion
Date: March 21, 2019Motion
Date: March 25, 2019Opposition
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion for New Trial
Date: May 17, 2019Motion
Date: April 15, 2019Motion
Date: April 14, 2019Response
Date: April 15, 2019Opposition
Date: March 18, 2019Response
Date: March 18, 2019Opposition
Date: March 26, 2019Response
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Memo
Date: April 03, 2019Response to Motion
Date: March 18, 2019Motion to Set Aside
Date: May 17, 2019Opposition
Date: March 26, 2019Brief
Date: April 09, 2019Opposition
Date: April 26, 2019Opposition
Date: March 18, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: October 12, 2018Opposition
Date: March 18, 2019Agreed Order
Date: April 18, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 25, 2019Agreed Order Granting
Date: January 23, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Notice
Date: March 07, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 07, 2019Motion for Entry of Judgment
Date: May 20, 2019Brief
Date: July 24, 2019Unopposed Motion
Date: March 21, 2019Opposition
Date: April 30, 2019Memo
Date: May 02, 2019Motion
Date: April 30, 2019Opposition
Date: April 30, 2019Motion
Date: April 30, 2019Opposition
Date: April 30, 2019Opposition
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: April 18, 2019Response to Motion
Date: April 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Hearing
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTSParty: Plaintiff Zingaro, Karla Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Party: Defendant Lorillard Tobacco Co Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.