Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Ali J. Javaheri, Javaheri , Ali J., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., represented by Narita, Tomio B., Tomio B. Narita, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with George C. Hernandez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management141 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryFraud |
|
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions121 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Case Cycle Time772 days |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Ali J. Javaheri, Express Realty
Date: December 10, 2010Cross-Complaint Filed for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Date: October 04, 2010Answer to Complaint Filed for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Date: October 04, 2010Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed
Date: September 07, 2010Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 31, 2010Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: August 31, 2010Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 11, 2012Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 11, 2012Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: October 11, 2012Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: 2012-10-10T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/11/2012 02:30 PM D- 514
Date: 2011-09-12T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2011-08-25T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 08/25/2011 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: 2011-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Defendant
Date: 2011-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ali J. Javaheri Filed
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ali J. Javaheri Filed
Date: 2011-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed
Date: 2011-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2011-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ali J. Javaheri Filed
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Ali J. Javaheri, Express Realty
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2010-10-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed
Date: 2010-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/19/2011 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ali J. Javaheri
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Unlimited Paper File Verified and Destroyed
Date: December 09, 2014Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 11, 2012Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 11, 2012Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 11, 2012Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: October 10, 2012Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: October 11, 2012Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/11/2012 02:30 PM D- 514
Date: September 12, 2011Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 07, 2011Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 19, 2011Case Management Statement of Ali J. Javaheri Filed
Date: February 22, 2011Case Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 607 date: 07/11/2011 time: 02:30 PM
Date: 2011-07-07T00:00:00Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 19, 2011Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: August 25, 2011Case Management Statement of Ali J. Javaheri Filed
Date: June 27, 2011Hearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 607 date: 10/11/2012 time: 02:30 PM
Date: 2011-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed
Date: January 04, 2011Case Management Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed
Date: February 22, 2011Case Management Conf Continuance 07/11/2011 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: 2011-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: January 31, 2011Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 19, 2011Compliance Hearing 08/25/2011 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: July 08, 2011Case Management Conf Continuance 03/07/2011 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: 2011-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 07, 2011Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Defendant
Date: June 29, 2011Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Hearing Dropped from dept: 607 date: 02/17/2011 time: 02:30 PM
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ali J. Javaheri Filed
Date: December 27, 2010Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 14, 2010Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 607 date: 02/17/2011 time: 02:30 PM
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Court File Transfer to Fremont Hall of Justice
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/19/2011 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: September 01, 2010Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: September 01, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ali J. Javaheri
Date: August 31, 2010Notice of Mediator Report Filed
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Date Filed
Date: 2011-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Date Filed
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2011-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Report Filed
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Date Filed
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2011-04-20T00:00:00Referred to Court Mediation
Date: 2011-03-07T00:00:00Mediator selected06/24/2011 - 2.3 hrs; updated by glabogin
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Date Filed
Date: 2011-05-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.