Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gayle M. Ormond, Ormond, Gayle M., filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Hogarty, William R., Larder, Nadine, Larder, Thomas J., Nadine Larder, Olympic Funding, Inc., A California Corporation, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2004 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement Filed
Date: October 06, 2004Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 14, 2004Notice of Settlement Filed for Gayle M. Ormond
Date: September 27, 2004Letter re Filed
Date: August 18, 2004Miscellaneous Notice Of Unavailability Filed
Date: August 17, 2004Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 23, 2004Case Management Statement of Gayle M. Ormond Filed
Date: June 08, 2004Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2004 03:30 PM D- 703
Date: April 28, 2004General Denial To Complaint Filed for Surety Bonding Company of America
Date: April 05, 2004Answer to Complaint Filed for Nadine Larder
Date: April 05, 2004Proof of Service on Complaint As to William R. Hogarty Filed
Date: March 23, 2004Proof of Service on Complaint As to Thomas J. Larder Filed
Date: March 23, 2004Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 23, 2004Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gayle M. Ormond Filed
Date: March 08, 2004Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gayle M. Ormond
Date: February 23, 2004Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: February 23, 2004Letter re Continuance Filed
Date: August 19, 2004Answer to Complaint Filed for Nadine Larder
Date: 2004-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Thomas J. Larder Filed
Date: 2004-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gayle M. Ormond Filed
Date: 2004-06-08T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2004 03:30 PM D- 703
Date: 2004-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2004-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gayle M. Ormond Filed
Date: 2004-03-08T00:00:00Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2004-03-23T00:00:00Letter re Continuance Filed
Date: 2004-08-19T00:00:00Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement Filed
Date: 2004-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Olympic Funding, Inc., a California Corporation Filed
Date: 2004-03-23T00:00:00Letter re Filed
Date: 2004-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of William R. Hogarty, Olympic Funding, Inc., a California Corporation, Th
Date: 2004-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 14, 2004General Denial To Complaint Filed for Surety Bonding Company of America
Date: 2004-04-05T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for William R. Hogarty, Olympic Funding, Inc., a California Corporation, T
Date: 2004-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Gayle M. Ormond
Date: 2004-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to William R. Hogarty Filed
Date: 2004-03-23T00:00:00Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: 2004-02-23T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Nadine Larder, Surety Bonding Company of
Date: 2004-10-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Notice Of Unavailability Filed
Date: 2004-08-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gayle M. Ormond
Date: 2004-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Nadine Larder, Surety Bonding Company of America Filed
Date: 2004-06-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.