Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Baldwin, Richard F, Oak Creek Investments Llc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Browning, John G, Cole, Ryan, Gilbert, Chris L., against Atlas Frm Llc, Bennett, Chris, Bursky, Andrew M, Dinning, Tanya, Liebich, Kurt, (total of 8) See All represented by Garrett, Maria A., Hopkins, Jason M., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Oak Creek Investments, LLC and Richard F. Baldwin, Ph.D. (collectively, "Petitioners") filed a verified petition requesting deposition before suit of Winston Plywood & Veneer LLC, WPV Holdco LLC, New Wood Resources LLC, and Atlas FRM LLC d/b/a Atlas ...
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 06, 2021ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 01, 2021ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: October 11, 2021MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 20, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 19, 2021MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: October 05, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 25, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 25, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: December 13, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 15, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 01, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: December 07, 2021OBJECTION
Date: December 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: October 25, 2021RESPONSE
Date: February 02, 2022SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: December 07, 2021MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: December 07, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 16, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: December 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 06, 2022Special Appearance
Date: February 10, 2022RESPONSE
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER - LEAVE
Date: December 17, 2021REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: May 19, 2022REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: May 19, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST
Date: May 23, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: April 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 27, 2022COA - POST CARD
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 13, 2023CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: May 25, 2022COA - POST CARD
Date: November 14, 2022OPINION
Date: January 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: May 03, 2022Motion - Dismiss
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 01, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: February 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: April 01, 2022COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: January 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 16, 2023COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: May 23, 2022COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: March 23, 2023CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: May 20, 2022MANDATE AFFIRM
Date: March 23, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 20, 2023APPELLATE RECORD
Date: November 10, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: March 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON RESPONDENTS OBJECTIONS TO RULE 202 PETITION MOTION HEARING (IN PERSON) 30M ANGELA STARLING 305-302-4353 (RESET BY SHERRY FAULKNER 214-743-4554 |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MANDATE AFFIRM | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO ADMIN RE: MANDATE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LTR Court Coordinator, re Mandate |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON RESPONDENTS OBJECTIONS TO RULE 202 PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: RESPONDANTS OBJECTIONS TO RULE 202 PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED RE: RESPONDANTS OBJECTIONS TO RULE 202 PETITION |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OBJECTIONS TO RULE 202 PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: OBJECTIONS TO RULE 202 PETITION |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
OPINION AFFIRM |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.