Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Walker, Michael, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Aziz, Muhammad S., against Pioneer Natural Resources Usa Inc, Polypipe Handling Specialists Inc, represented by Doherty, Brendan P, Peavler, Donna C, Ramirez, Shannon R, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: August 24, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2021MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: July 12, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: September 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 05, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: September 16, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 30, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 23, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: October 29, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 05, 2021Motion - Transfer
Date: September 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 26, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: December 03, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: March 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 31, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE MOTION - DISMISS JOINT - W/PREJUDICE |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment 30M - D/TRADT'L/NO EVID MSJ (PIONEER) 214-999-0550 - SARA SCUDDAY - ***IN PERSON HEARING** CC REQ'D |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
3RD AMD NOH MSJ Motion - Summary Judgment 1HR - D/MSJ AND D/NO EVID MSJ (POLYPIPE) - RHOHDA RACKLEY- 832-255-6023 - IN PERSON HEARING - CC REQ'D |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING - LEVEL 3 NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT SCHEDULING - LEVEL 3 |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT D/NO EVID/TRADT'L MSJ- 10/13/2022 - 9:00AM |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MSJ - APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MISCELLANOUS EVENT APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.