Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kaz Meyers Properties, Llc, Madison Title Agency, Llc, Mhnc Meyers, Llc, Smhnc Meyers, Llc, Ykhknc Meyers, Llc, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Singapura, Kartik, Wood, Eric C, against Kaz Meyers Properties, Llc, Madison Title Agency, Llc, Mhnc Meyers, Llc, Smhnc Meyers, Llc, Ten-X, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Kessler, Gary S, Singapura, Kartik, Wood, Eric C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 25, 2021Motion - Dismiss
Date: September 30, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 22, 2021MOTION - TRANSFER - NO CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: April 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 11, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2021ORDER - TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATE
Date: May 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 27, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 24, 2021ORDER - REALIGN
Date: June 30, 2021Motion - Dismiss
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: September 30, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 23, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 19, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 21, 2021REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: June 09, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: June 29, 2021MOTION - COMPEL RESPONSE TO
Date: September 17, 2021MOTION - STAY
Date: January 27, 2022MOTION - REALIGN
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: September 27, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 28, 2021WAIVER
Date: April 19, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: May 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 30, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 21, 2023WAIVER
Date: April 19, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2021REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: April 04, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-SERVE COVER LETTER - ORDER LIFT STAY, RELEASE FUNDS AND DISMISS MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE COVER LETTER & ORDER LIFT STAY, RELEASE FUNDS AND DISMISS |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION LIFT STAY, RELEASE FUNDS & DISMISS MOTION - MISCELLANOUS LIFT STAY, RELEASE FUNDS & DISMISS |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT LIFT STAY, RELEASE FUNDS & DISMISS |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO STAY MOTION - STAY JOINT |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO STAY NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
FOURTH AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS Motion - Dismiss ***VIA ZOOM*** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.