Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Yun James, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Amezcua-Moll Rosemary, Yun Andy Sung Bin, against Chang Steve, Kin Young, Kl Fenix Corp. A California Corporation, Klf Logistics Inc. A California, represented by Lim Shi Young, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton Courthouse with Maurice A. Leiter presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management338 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions830 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseCompton Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time842 days |
Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice OF INTENTION TO MOVE TO VACATE JUDGMENT; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Services by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Document:Exhibit List Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Trial Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Jury Question Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: KL FENIX CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Reply Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration of Sarah Nowels re Attorney's Fees; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: KLF LOGISTICS, INC. A CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Declaration of Andy Yun re Attorney's Fees; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: KLF LOGISTICS, INC. A CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine -
Date: July 20, 2018Motion in Limine -
Date: July 23, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 04, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 07, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 04, 2019Opposition - Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs
Date: March 06, 2019Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: March 12, 2019Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: March 13, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 21, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: March 27, 2019Minute order entered: 2017-04-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by KLF LOGISTICS, INC. A CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Summons Issued Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Opposition Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Reply Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Objection Document Filed Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Witness List Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by KLF LOGISTICS, INC. A CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by STEVE CHANG (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Reply Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing re: Plaintiff's Business and Professions Code 17200 C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Opposition Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by KLF LOGISTICS, INC. A CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by null
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Proposed Judgment) Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees) Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Pltf's Closing Brief Re: Business & Professions Code 17200 Claim Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs) Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENTION TO MOVE TO VACATE JUDGMENT) Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by KLF LOGISTICS, INC. A CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by KLF LOGISTICS, INC. A CALIFORNIA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Judgment Filed by KL FENIX CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Tax...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Document:Exhibit List Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Pltf's Closing Brief Re: Business & Professions Code 17200 Claim; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application; Filed by: Legacy
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Objection Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Proposed Judgment; Filed by: JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Document:Special Verdict Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Court
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Andy Yun re Attorney's Fees) Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarah Nowels re Attorney's Fees) Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by KL FENIX CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by JAMES YUN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Pltf's Closing Brief Re: Business & Professions Code 17200 Claim
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENTION TO MOVE TO VACATE JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing re: Plaintiff's Business and Professions Code 17200 C...))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarah Nowels re Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Brief (in Opposition to Plantiff's Business and Professions Code 17200 Claims)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Andy Yun re Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental Brief re Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply to Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/14/2019)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motin to Tax Costs and Declaration of Sarah Nowels)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Tax...))
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Lori LillienFeld))
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and/or Tax Defendants' Costs)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.