Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Janet Ugale And Jobany Rodriguez, Individually, And On Behalf Of Other Members Of The General Public Similarly Situated And On Behalf Of Aggrieved Employees Pursuant To The Private Attorneys General Act, Janet Ugale Individually And On Behalf Of Other Members Of The General Public Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Allen Distribution, Lp, A Pennsylvania Limited Partnership, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is a class action complaint for damages filed by Janet Ugale, individually and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated, against Allen Distribution, LP and Does 1 through 100. The complaint alleges multiple v...
Tentative Ruling published.
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Related Case filed by Allen Distribution, LP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership.
Date: September 29, 2021Minutes finalized for Motion for Approval of Class Settlement held on 09/02/2021 09:00 AM .
Date: September 02, 2021Tentative Ruling published.
Date: September 01, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: July 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Payment received by individually, Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 709612.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Jenny D. Baysinger in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Class/PAGA Representative Enhancement Payments filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Declaration in Support Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of service filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Proof of Service Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Janet Ugale in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Class/PAGA Representative Enhancement Payments filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Declaration in Support Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Jobany Rodriguez Han in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Class/PAGA Representative Enhancement Payments filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Declaration in Support Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Taylor Mitzner Regarding Notice and Settlement Administration filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Declaration Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Douglas Han in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Class/PAGA Representative Enhancement Payments filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Declaration in Support Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FILED RECORD SEALED Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Class/PAGA Representative Enhancement Payments; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Janet Ugale and Jobany Rodriguez, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated and on behalf of aggrieved employees pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act ('PAGA'). Motion or other paper requesting a hearing Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.