Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Schiff, Tom, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Yolies Tow, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management258 days |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions286 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/27/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: October 27, 2020Settlement Conference Statement filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: February 25, 2022Reply to Opposition to Demurrers filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: May 29, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: October 09, 2020Reply to Opposition on Motion to Strike filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: May 29, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: May 29, 2020Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: October 14, 2020Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: October 13, 2020Substitution of Attorney filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: August 25, 2020Order regarding Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike filed by Tom Schiff.
Date: July 23, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/25/2020 09:00 AM .
Date: June 25, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: June 24, 2020Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 06/05/2020 09:00 AM .
Date: June 05, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: June 01, 2020Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: March 02, 2020Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Non-Opposition to Yole's Towing & Transport LLC's Demurrers filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: February 28, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Hearing on Demurrers filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: February 05, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrers filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: February 05, 2020Demurrers filed by Yolies Tow.
Date: February 05, 2020Proof of service filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: October 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: October 11, 2019Summons issued and filed.
Date: October 11, 2019Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: October 11, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schiff, Tom.
Date: October 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Settlement Conference Statement filed by Yolies Tow. Settlement Conference Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement filed by Schiff, Tom. Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 03/21/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 03/07/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on October 27, 2020.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/27/2020 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Schiff, Tom. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Yolies Tow. Answer Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Yolies Tow. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Lauren Weidner, retained for Tom Schiff .
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.