Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gutierrez, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Robert L. Driessen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert L. Driessen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims ≫ 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a small claims case between Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp and Daniel Gutierrez. The case number is SMCFS2001522. The claim was filed on 02/28/20 for an amount of $2,500. The hearing date is set for 05/04/20 at 10:00 AM in Department ...
Claim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) (imaged)
Date: February 28, 2020Notice Mailed to Parties
Date: May 28, 2020Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: September 13, 2021Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: July 27, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 24, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: July 29, 2020Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor Printed
Date: July 27, 2020Writ of Execution Issued - Sacramento
Date: September 16, 2021Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: November 24, 2021Writ of Execution Issued - Sacramento
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Postdisposition)
Date: October 06, 2022Bankruptcy Discharge
Date: January 13, 2023Writ of Execution Returned - Sacramento
Date: January 30, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.